M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank v. Wright et al

Plaintiff: M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank
Defendant: Kyle Wright, Shauna Brauchler, Camelback Title Agency, Joan Patterson, First American Title Insurance Company, Reliant Appraisal Services and Lyle Gallagher
Case Number: 2:2009cv01983
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft Joan Patterson's Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Answer (Doc. 109) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Dft Camelback Title Agency's Second Motion to Amend Answer (Doc. 110) is GRANTED, provided that, Camelback corrects i ts amended complaint as explained above. If the Court has incorrectly interpreted Camelback's intent, Camelback's motion is denied without prejudice to a subsequent motion explaining the paragraph in question. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Dft First American Title Insurance Company's Motion for Leave to Amend the Answer and Cross-Claim (Doc. 113) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Dft Shauna Brauchler's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer (Doc. 116) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that P la M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank's Revised Amended Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Doc. 126) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that, in accord with LRCiv 15.1, all parties have 14 days from the filing of this order to file and serve their respective amended pleadings on all other parties under Fed. R. Civ. P. 5. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank shall adhere to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 with respect to the newly added defendants. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/1/10.(KMG)
April 16, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 - that CTA provide further briefing by April 26, 2010, with accompanying affidavits, if necessary, to support its contention that it has a meritorious defense. Plaintiff will then have until May 6, 2010, to respond. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/16/10. (DMT)
January 29, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk's Entry of Default doc. # 27 is vacated. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla's Application for Entry of Default against Camelback Title Agency doc. # 25 is denied. FURTHER ORDERED extending the time for service of Dft Camelback Title Agency to March 1, 2010. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/29/10. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank
Represented By: Rachel M Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shauna Brauchler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camelback Title Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Appraisal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?