Zinni

Plaintiff: Renee M Zinni
Case Number: 2:2009cv02035
Filed: September 29, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Damages and Attorneys' Fees 88 ; granting the Bank's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees 82 in the amount of $7,500. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/12/11.(REW)
August 11, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING the Bank's motion for expedited consideration (doc. 75) and GRANTING the Bank's motion to quash the preliminary injunction and to dismiss its counterclaims without prejudice (doc. 74). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint (doc. 92). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/11/2011.(KMG)
May 11, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' motion for summary judgment 64 , and denying plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment 59 . Judgment is granted in favor of defendant M&I Marshall & Ilsley Bank and against plaintiffs on all claims. ORDER denying plaintiffs' motion to strike as moot 60 . ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against Larry Hargrove 58 . Plaintiffs shall file with the court a proposed form of default judgment against Hargrove no later than 10 days from entry of this order. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/10/11.(TLJ)
February 12, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING pla's 36 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Bank is enjoined from authorizing a trustee's sale of plas'property pending the outcome of this action. This order binds the parties, their office rs, agents, servants, employees, and attys, including but not limited to the Trustee under the deed of trust. No additional security is required under Rule 65(c), Fed. R. Civ. P., as the property is the security. Plas are entitled to possession of their property for the duration of this injunction. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/12/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zinni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee M Zinni
Represented By: Carl Robert Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?