Robinson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Michael Robinson and Christine Robinson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Michael A Bosco, Jr
Case Number: 2:2009cv02066
Filed: October 1, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk will dismiss this case. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/18/10.(TLJ)
December 10, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Plaintiffs' supplemental brief re: motion to stay due 12/14/2009. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's motion to dismiss due 12/14/2009. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/10/09. (JAT)
November 3, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within five days, the removing Defendant shall comply with Local Rule 3.7 and file any portion of the state court record not filed with the notice of removal. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/09. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Colleen Schiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Bosco, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?