Jones v. Bank of America, N.A.

Plaintiff: Kevin R Jones
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02129
Filed: October 9, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 Defendant's Motion to Vacate the Court's "Insurance Ruling" in its June 1, 2010 Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/28/11.(DMT)
July 30, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff may move for reconsideration of the order denying the motion for preliminary injunction within 14 days of the Court of Appeals decision (in other words, by 08/11/10). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 07/30/10. (ESL)
June 22, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff Kevin Jones's First Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/22/10.(DMT)
June 1, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 39 is GRANTED as to Counts Two and Four of the Complaint, and that Count Four is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 39 is DENIED as to Counts Three, Five, and Six of the Complaint. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/1/10.(LAD)
December 3, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's supplemental brief for PI hearing due by Noon, Monday, December 7, 2009. Plaintiff's supplemental brief re jurisdiction due by Tuesday, December 8, 2009. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/3/09. (JAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin R Jones
Represented By: Robert M Back
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?