IDEARC MEDIA LLC v. PALMISANO & ASSOCIATES, P.C. et al

Plaintiff: IDEARC MEDIA LLC
Defendant: PALMISANO & ASSOCIATES, P.C. and PALMISANO LAW, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv02147
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 63 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $78,562.00 in attorney fees. ORDERED denying without prejudice James E. Brown, P.C.'s 70 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/21/2014.(LFIG)
September 5, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Doc. 63) within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall have seven (7) days from t he date the response is filed to file a reply in support of their Motion for Attorneys' Fees. If defendants fail to file a response within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, the Court will deem the non-response consent to granting the Motion for Attorneys' Fees and will award such attorneys' fees without further notice to the parties. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/5/2013.(TLB)
March 6, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 48 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants Palmisano & Associates and Palmisano Law in the amount of $187,068.00, plus interes t to September 16, 2009 in the amount of $12,501.54, plus interest from September 16, 2009 to the date of this Order at a rate of 18% per annum, jointly and severally. ORDERED that any Motion for Attorneys' Fees and/or Request for Cos ts shall be filed as set forth in LRCiv 54.1 and LRCiv 54.2. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent Plaintiff's claims for open account and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing are not subsumed in the grant of summary judgment, those claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/5/2013. (LFIG)
April 13, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order Dismissing Palmisano Law, PLLC without Prejudice or, in the alternative, for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. Plaintiff s hall file and serve the amended complaint on all parties within fourteen days of this Order. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint within ten days of being served. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/12/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IDEARC MEDIA LLC v. PALMISANO & ASSOCIATES, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDEARC MEDIA LLC
Represented By: Cory L Braddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMISANO & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMISANO LAW, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?