B2B CFO Partners, LLC et al v. Kaufman et al

Plaintiff: B2B CFO Partners, LLC, B2B CFO, LLC, Jerry Mills and Christine Mills
Defendant: Kenneth A Kaufman, Kaufman Enterprise Solutions, LLC, CFO WISE, INC. and The CFO Wise Promise, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv02158
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2012 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 182 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt and denying 249 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Order to Show Cause and denying 249 Motion to Reconvene Contempt Hearing. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/29/12.(LSP)
March 5, 2012 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 169 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Trade Secret Claim; denying 199 Defendant Kaufman's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim for Breach of Fiduciary Duty; denyi ng 217 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Kaufman's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Controverting Statement of Facts; and denying as moot 220 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/5/12.(LSP)
December 16, 2011 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 188 Motion for Entry of Default FURTHER ORDERED granting 201 Stipulated Motion to Remove and Seal. The Clerk shall strike Defendants' Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 200 ). Def endants shall re-file their SSOF with a redacted copy of Exhibit D, leaving unredacted the provisions specified in this Order, into the public record. Defendants shall also file an un-redacted copy of Exhibit D under seal. FURTHER ORDERED granting /denying in part 208 Stipulated Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall strike the portions of Exhibit B to the CSOF currently lodged at Docket 209 . Plaintiffs shall have five days from the date of this Order to re-file those portions into the public rec ord. The Clerk shall file under seal the portions of Exhibit H to the CSOF currently lodged at Docket 210 . The Clerk shall strike the portion of Exhibit J to the CSOF currently lodged at Docket 211 . Plaintiffs shall have five days from the date of this Order to re-file into the public record the specified portion of Exhibit J with Mr. Baker's social security number redacted. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/16/11.(MAP)
July 13, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Plaintiffs' Motion to for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall have nine days from the date of this Order to file the Second Amended Complaint, or until July 22, 2011. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 158 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. All parties shall have until August 22, 2011, to complete discovery on the claim for breach of fiduciary duty and any dispositive motion pursuant to this order is due by August 31, 2011. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/13/11.(LSP)
February 8, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 107 Defendants' Motion/Application for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/8/11.(LSP)
May 25, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion to Seal. Clerk shall unseal documents #74, 75, and 77 FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 76 Motion for another Rule 16 Conference...See Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/25/10. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B2B CFO Partners, LLC et al v. Kaufman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B2B CFO Partners, LLC
Represented By: Gregory L Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B2B CFO, LLC
Represented By: Gregory L Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Mills
Represented By: Gregory L Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Mills
Represented By: Gregory L Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth A Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaufman Enterprise Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFO WISE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The CFO Wise Promise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?