Trueman v. Hawaii, State of et al

Plaintiff: James K. Trueman
Defendant: Hawaii, State of, Public Safety, Department of, Corrections Corporation of America, Darren Swenson, Jason Johnson, Avena, Molina, J. Valenzurla and Hidalgo
Case Number: 2:2009cv02179
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, due to plaintiff's non-compliance with the time frame, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice, subject to any statute of limitations defense. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/17/12. (DMT)
March 13, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for the court's assistance in obtaining the names and addresses of the defendants (Unknown Avena, Jason Johnson, and Unknown Molina). The court further finds and ORDERS that plaintiff shall be allowed to conduct limited discovery as indicated in this order. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order within which to serve and file his written questions. If plaintiff does not comply with the time frame herein for commencing this limited discovery, this case shall be dismissed "without prejudice," subject to any statute of limitations defense. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/12/12. (see order for full details)(DMT)
December 21, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), plaintiff is GRANTED sixty (60) days from the date of this Order in which to conduct discovery as to the names and addresses of defendants Unknown Avena, Jason Johnson and Unknown Molina, and to provide written notice to this court as to the foregoing, or that plaintiff was unable to discover that information. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/21/11. (DMT)
October 4, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Count I and Defendant Swenson are dismissed without prejudice. (Doc. 17.) Defendants Johnson, Avena, and Molina must answer Count II. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complain t (Doc. 17), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Johnson, Avena, and Molina. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/4/10. (DMT)
July 26, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 14 motion for an extension of time is granted to the extent set forth below. Pla is granted until August 16, 2010 in which to file a first amended complaint in compliance with the 06/15/10 Order. If Pla fails to comply, the Cl erk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 07/25/10. (ESL)
June 16, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James K. Trueman. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/16/10. (TLJ)
June 15, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James K Trueman. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/15/10. (KMG)
September 25, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER 1 James K. Trueman. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY. (eps ) -- This action is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona, Phoenix Division. All pending motions, including Plaintiff's appli cation to proceed in forma pauperis, shall be TRANSFERRED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file and send any further documents received from Plaintiff to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, Phoenix Division CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications are served by first class mail [Transferred from hid on 10/16/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trueman v. Hawaii, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James K. Trueman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Safety, Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Valenzurla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidalgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?