Stewart v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Stewart, Jr
Defendant: Charles Ryan, H. Matson, Unknown Deleon and Unknown Allen
Case Number: 2:2009cv02193
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 60(b) Relief and denying as moot 62 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk must send a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals referencing case number 11-16261. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/8/11.(LSP)
May 25, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 52) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 53) is denied. Plaintiff's appeal from this Court's final judgment is no t taken in good faith and Plaintiff is not entitled to in forma pauperis status on appeal. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A). The Clerk of Court must send a copy of this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals referencing case number 11-16261. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/25/11.(KMG)
April 21, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 43). Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 43) is granted. This action is dismissed without prejudice and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/21/11.(KMG)
October 12, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's September 13, 2010 Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 29) is denied. Plaintiff's September 13, 2010 Motion for an Alternative Writ (Doc. 30) is denied. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/10/10.(KMG)
September 24, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Counts II and III, and the claims on pages 1k-1l are dismissed without prejudice. Dfts Matson, Allen, Romos and the individuals listed on pages 1h-1k of the Second Amended Complaint, unless specifically mentioned, are dismisse d without prejudice. Dfts Lockhart, Malcolm, Ryan, Gilbert, Currans, Barcklay, and Franco must answer the Eighth Amendment claims in Count I, as described in Section III of this Order. The Clerk of Court must correct the docket to show Dfts Lockhart, Malcolm, Ryan, Gilbert, Currans, Barcklay, and Franco as active Dfts in this action. The Clerk of Court must send Pla a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 27), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Df ts Lockhart, Malcolm, Ryan, Gilbert, Currans, Barcklay, and Franco. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/22/10. (KMG)
August 3, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla's July 12, 2010 Motion 24 for Extension of Time is denied; Pla has 10 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with the April 27, 2010 screening Order. If Pla fails to file a second ame nded complaint within 10 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Pla's Motion 22 for Writ of Habeas Corpus Order is denied. Pla's Motion 25 for Preserving Videotape is denied. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/2/10.(KMG)
May 25, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has 60 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/23/10.(TLJ)
March 11, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla's 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Pla's 13 "Motion Requesting Permission to Add New Co-Defendants" is granted. Pla's 14 Motion for Extension Time is granted; Pla has 30 days from the filing dat e of this Order to file an amended complaint that complies with the Court's 01/20/10 Order. If Pla fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Pla's 15 Motion for Response on Pending Motions is granted to the extent that this Order addresses Pla's previously filed Motions. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 03/10/10.(ESL)
January 20, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Thomas Stewart, Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/17/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stewart, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Matson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Deleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?