Long v. TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc

Plaintiff: Kenneth Long
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv02209
Filed: October 21, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2011 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 205 MOTION (Notice of Refiling) to Exclude Testimony filed by TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/20/2011. (NVO)
October 14, 2011 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 167 Motion in Limine; denying 168 Motion in Limine; denying 169 Motion in Limine; denying 170 Motion in Limine; denying 171 Motion in Limine; denying 172 Motion in Limine; denying 173 Motion in Limine; denying [174 ] Motion in Limine; denying 175 Motion in Limine; denying 176 Motion in Limine; denying 177 Motion in Limine; denying 178 Motion in Limine; denying 179 Motion in Limine; denying 180 Motion in Limine; denying 181 Motion in Limine ; granting 182 Motion in Limine; denying 183 Motion in Limine; denying 184 Motion in Limine; denying 185 Motion in Limine; denying 186 Motion in Limine; denying 187 Motion in Limine; denying 188 Motion in Limine; denying 189 M otion in Limine; denying 190 Motion in Limine; granting 191 Motion in Limine; granting 193 Motion in Limine; denying 194 Motion in Limine; denying 195 Motion in Limine; denying 196 Motion in Limine; granting 197 Motion in Limine; denying 198 Motion in Limine; denying 199 Motion in Limine; denying 200 Motion in Limine; granting 201 Motion in Limine; granting 209 Motion in Limine; denying 210 Motion in Limine; denying 211 Motion in Limine; granting 212 Motion in Limine; denying 213 Motion in Limine; denying 214 Motion in Limine; granting 215 Motion in Limine; denying 216 Motion in Limine; granting 217 Motion in Limine; granting 218 Motion in Limine; denying 219 Motion in Limine . The trial in this matter shall begin on 4/10/2012 at 9:00 a.m. A final pretrial conference will be held on 3/29/2011 at 3:00 p.m. before the Honorable David G. Campbell, Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. The parties shall hold a settlement conference with a magistrate judge to be designated by the Court on or before 12/16/2011. The parties shall promptly notify the Court if a settlement is reached. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/14/2011.(NVO)
June 20, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 118 Motion to Strike ; denying 119 Motion to Strike ; denying 154 Motion to Strike. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/20/2011.(NVO)
April 29, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion for Protective Order; granting 32 Motion for Protective Order. The parties shall lodge a stipulated proposed non-sharing protective order and Defendant shall file a memorandum of five pages or less establishing good cause for the entry of that protective order on or before 5/14/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/29/2010.(NVO)
February 26, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss Case. The court will set a scheduling conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/26/2010.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc
Represented By: Sara V Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?