Matthews, et al v. NPMG Acquisition Sub, LLC

Plaintiff: Calvin Matthews, Tyrone Hunt and Michael Buckner
Defendant: NPMG Acquisition Sub LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv02326
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion for Attorney Fees. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/17/12.(LAD)
September 13, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/13/11.(LAD)
March 15, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Vacate Order and Judgment of Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 59(e) and F.R.Civ.P. 60(b)(1). (Doc. 24). Plaintiffs' request that the Court's July 30, 2010 Order be vacated is denied. Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(1), however, the Clerk of the Court's August 24, 2010 Judgment is vacated, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to reopen this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must file their First Amended Complaint with thi s Court no later than the close of business on March 22, 2011. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs fail to file their First Amended Complaint by March 22, 2011, the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/15/11.(LAD)
July 30, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/29/10. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. 12).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs leave to amend their Complaint. Any amended complaint must be received by this Court within fifteen days of the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 16).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiffs Motion to Convert Defendants Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss into a Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. 18). (KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews, et al v. NPMG Acquisition Sub, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Matthews
Represented By: Philip Jeffrey Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Hunt
Represented By: Philip Jeffrey Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Buckner
Represented By: Philip Jeffrey Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPMG Acquisition Sub LLC
Represented By: Juliet S Burgess
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Pasternak
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?