Quain v. Clear Channel Communications Inc. et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02365
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/2/11.(TLJ)
December 29, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' 42 motion for attorneys' fees is granted in part. Defendants are awarded $15,317.50 in attorneys' fees pursuant to A.R.S. § 12-341.01(A). Defendants' 53 motion to strike sur-reply is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/29/10. (ESL)
October 18, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend and to Compel Production of Documents. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/18/10.(TLJ)
June 22, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall have until July 9, 2010 to file a second amended complaint. The Court will not grant leave to file a third amended complaint. Denying as moot 25 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case. The Clerk is directed to mail to Plaintiff a copy of the Court's February 25, 2010 order 21 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/22/10.(DMT)
April 29, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until 5/14/10 to file a response to Defendants' motion to dismiss 25 . The Court will summarily grant the motion to dismiss if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/29/10. (TLJ)
February 25, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' Motion for a More Definite Statement 11 is granted. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by 3/19/10. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Findings of Facts and Second Discovery Request for Production of Documents 14 is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed to Discovery and Trial on the Facts 18 is denied. Defendants' Motion to Strike sur-reply 19 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/25/10.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quain v. Clear Channel Communications Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?