The Householder Group, LLLP v. Van Mason et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02370
Filed: November 12, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER, denying THG's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 78 on the issue of breach of contract; granting the Former Managers' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 73 on the issue of THG's trade secrets claims; setting the Final Pretrial Conference for 11/14/12 at 2:00 p.m.; Proposed Pretrial Order due 10/19/12 (see order for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/30/12. (REW)
December 8, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 42 Motion for Hearing on Motion. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/7/10.(KSP)
September 27, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 46 Joint Motion for Additional Time for Settlement Conference. The start time for the Tuesday, November 16, 2010 settlement conference shall be 1:00 p.m. (Arizona time). All other requested relief is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all orders in the April 27, 2010 settlement conference order other than the start time are hereby AFFIRMED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/27/10.(LAD)
May 21, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSOLIDATION ORDER - LEAD CASE - Pursuant to 33 Motion to Consolidate Cases (this action with CV 10-918-PHX-MHM), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these cases be consolidated in order to promote consistency and judicial economy. All future filings shall note the consolidation in the caption and be filed solely under the lower case number CV 09-2370-PHX-MHM. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 5/20/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Householder Group, LLLP v. Van Mason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?