Taylor v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02393
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Consumer Credit Office
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The United States' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The claims asserted against the federal Defendants (the United States, the Internal Revenue Service, the Department of Education, the Department of the Treasury, and their employees) are dismissed under Rule 12(b)(1) for lack of jurisdiction. The motion is denied as moot to the extent it is brought pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Plaintiff shall have until May 27, 2011 to show cause why the Court should not dismi ss the claims against Defendants Lamson Junior College, Arizona Education Loan Marketing Corporation, Southwest Student Services Corporation, and their employees. The Clerk is directed to dismiss those defendants and terminate the action without further notice if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/13/11.(KMG)
December 22, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's application for entry of default (Doc. 92) is denied. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or default judgment (Doc. 96) is denied. The time period under Rule 4(m) for service of process on the United States and its agencies is extended to January 21, 2011. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will not extend this deadline absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/10.(KMG)
August 26, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Ex Parte Motion to Vacate andSet Aside Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/10.(MAP)
July 19, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Defendant Trans Union LLC's Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; granting 55 Defendant Landsafe Credit Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss with prejudice; granting 57 Defendant Kroll Factual Data, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss with prejudice Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/10.(TLJ)
June 14, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of each motion to dismiss Dkt. ## 52 , 55 , 57 to Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall file a response to each motion by July 2, 2010. Plaintiff is warned that no further extensions will be granted. Plaintiff is further warned that the Court will summarily grant the motions to dismiss if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/14/10. (KMG)
June 1, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pla shall have until 6/11/10 to file responses to the motions to dismiss 52 , 55 , 57 . Pla is warned that the Court will summarily grant the motions to dismiss if pla fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/1/10. (LAD)
February 26, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim for relief 15 , 35 , and 42 are granted. The alternative motions for more definite statement are denied as moot. The complaint (Dkt. #1-1 at 5-37) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until 3/19/10 to file an amended complaint. Defendant Kroll Factual Data, Inc.'s motion to dismiss for failure to name proper party and for improper service 35 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motions to strike 29 , 43 , and 44 are denied. Plaintiff's motions for laches, for summary judgment, and for judgment on the pleadings 44 are denied.Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/25/10.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?