Jeffrey C. Stone, Inc. d/b/a Summit Builders Construction Company v. Greenberg Traurig, LLP et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02454
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2011 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Defendant Greenberg Traurig LLP's 212 Motion for Attorneys' Fees in the amount of $27,300; awarding attorneys' fees to Defendants DeConcini McDonald Yetwin & Lacy, P.C. in the amount of $15,592.50; awarding attorneys' fees to Defendant Francine Coles in an amount to be determined; awarding attorneys' fees to Defendant Coles Estate in an amount to be determined; awarding attorneys' fees to Defendants Ashley Coles, Christopher Olson and Rac hel Schwartz-Olson, George and Mary Jane Everette, Mike and Donna Denning, Nechelle and John Doe Wimmer, Phillip Sollomi, Jr. and Carolyn L. Sollomi in an amount to be determined; awarding attorneys' fees to Defendant MCA Financial Group, Ltd. i n an amount to be determined; awarding attorneys' fees to Defendants Mayer Hoffman McCann P.C. and CBIZ Accounting, Tax & Advisory Services, LLC in an amount to be determined; awarding attorneys' fees to Defendants Zeleznak Family Trust, Ve nto Family Trust, Jonathan and Lori Vento, Donald and Shirley Zeleznak, and Ryan Zeleznak in an amount to be determined; awarding attorneys' fees to Defendants Hirsch & Shah, CPAs LLC in an amount to be determined; awarding the Coles Estate atto rneys' fees and costs in the amount of $15,511.45, to be paid by Summit as originally ordered; denying as moot MCA Financial Group, Ltd.'s 206 Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions; denying as moot Defendants DeConcini McDonald Yetwin & Lacy, P.C.'s 213 Application for Award of Attorneyss Fees; denying Defendant Francine Coles' 250 Motion for Further Sanctions Against Grant H Goodman (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/21/11. (REW)
September 22, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice as to Defendants George and Mary Jane Everette and Defendant Francine Coles; dismissing this action without prejudice as to all remaining Defendants; dismissing the following motions as moot: Docs. 79 , [8 1], 84 , 89 , 91 , 94 , 100 , 115 , 162 , 164 , 165 , 166 , 168 , 194 , 199 , and 202 ; all other motions remain pending; requiring Summit within 14 days of the date of this order to show cause in writing why this Court should not impos e sanctions against Summit and its counsel, re: Defendants' motions for sanctions (Docs. 206, 212, 213); granting the parties' 216 Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Summit to respond to Defendant MCA Financial Group, Limited's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (Doc. 206) and requiring Summit to file its Response within 14 days of the date of this order; directing the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/21/10.(REW)
July 29, 2010 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/29/10. IT IS ORDERED granting the Coles Estates Motion to Remand (Doc. 97). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to remand case number PB 2008-001651, In the Matter of the Estate of Scott M. Coles, (Doc. 66) to the Superior Court of the State of Arizona in and for the County of Maricopa.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Coles Estates request for costs and attorneys fees in an amount to be determined upon the Coles Estates compliance with the requirements set forth in Local Rule 54.2. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Greenberg Traurigs Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in Connection with Greenberg Traurigs Motion to Dismiss Summits original complaint (Doc. 30).Quarles & Brady LLP having filed an Ex Parte Request to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendant Ashley Coles, and Ashley Coles having retained new counsel,IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Quarles & Brady LLPs Request to Withdraw as Counsel nunc pro tunc (Doc . 153).Summit having filed an Amended Complaint on January 18, 2010,IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot the following motions to dismiss the original complaint:Motion to Dismiss filed by MCA Financial Group, Ltd. (Doc. 11).Motion to Dismiss filed by Mayer Hoffman McCann P.C., et al. (Doc. 19).Motion to Dismiss filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax & Advisory Services, LLC (Doc. 22).Motion to Dismiss filed by DeConcini McDonald Yetwin & Lacy, PC (Doc. 29).Motion to Dismiss filed by Greenberg Traurig LLP (Doc. 32).Motion to Dismiss filed by Mike Denning, et al. (Doc. 63).Motion to Dismiss filed by Zeleznak Family Trust et al. (Doc. 74).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting oral argument on August 30, 2010, from 1:30 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. on the following motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint (Docs. 79, 81, 84, 91, 94, 100, 115). (KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey C. Stone, Inc. d/b/a Summit Builders Construction Company v. Greenberg Traurig, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?