Lowe's HIW, Inc. v. Thomas James Civil Design Group dba Thomas Graham Civil Design Group et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02481
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2013 917 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER, granting the parties' stipulation 915 ; dismissing with prejudice Lowe's claims against Defendants Ames, EMJ and Mortimer, with each of these parties to bear its own respective costs and attorneys' fees; dismissing with prejudice EMJ's counterclaim against Lowe's, with each of these parties to bear its own respective costs and attorneys' fees; dismissing with prejudice any remaining cross-claims by or against Ames, EMJ and Mortimer with each of these parties to bear its own respective costs and attorneyS' fees; granting Defendant Mortimer's Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion for Spoliation Sanction 914 ; Moritmer's motion for spoliation sanction 899 is hereby withdrawn and denied as moot; denying as moot Lowe's motion to confirm assignment and trial in the Phoenix division 866 ; the Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/26/13. (REW)
August 16, 2013 912 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to Parties' 911 Stipulation of Dismissal, dismissing with prejudice all claims by Lowe's against Kleinfelder and Kleinfelder's subcontractor, Defendant Geomechanics Southwest, Inc. with the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees; dismissing with prejudice all claims by Kleinfelder against Lowe's with the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/15/13. (REW)
August 12, 2013 910 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 909 Stipulation. Lowe's claims against Pacific are dismissed with prejudice, with each of these parties to bear its own respective costs and attorney's fees. ORDERED that Pacific's counterclaims against Lowe's are dismissed with prejudice, with each of these parties to bear its own respective costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/12/2013. (LFIG)
June 28, 2013 907 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the remaining Defendants' 905 Joint Motion for Dismissal of All Crossclaims With Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/26/2013. (See Order for details)(LFIG)
June 18, 2013 903 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the 902 Stipulation of Dismissal, dismissing with prejudice Pacific Lock + Load's cross-claims against Ames from this matter, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/17/13. (REW)
February 27, 2013 888 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Lowe's claims against Thomas Graham with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees re 885 Stipulation. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/26/13. (TLJ)
July 7, 2010 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; granting 240 Motion for Rule 16 Case Management Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set 7/22/10 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/7/10.(KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe's HIW, Inc. v. Thomas James Civil Design Group dba Thomas Graham Civil Design Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?