Mink v. State of Arizona et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02582
Filed: December 10, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Motion to Dismiss Defendant John Doe; granting 102 City Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 106 Plaintiff's Rule 60 Motion. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendants and terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/11/11.(TLJ)
July 6, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Defendant Sollars' Motion to Dismiss; party Linda L Sollars terminated. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/5/10.(LSP)
June 23, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the City Dfts' 48 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The Court will dismiss the § 1983 Fifth Amendment claims against all City Dfts. The Court will dismiss the negligence claim against Sorensen, Stokes, an d Trafan. The only claims pending against the City Dfts are a negligence claim against the City of Mesa and a § 1983 Fourteenth Amendment claim against Sorensen, Stokes, and Trafan. The State Dfts' 49 motion to dismiss is granted. The State Dfts are dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 06/23/10. (ESL)
March 26, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Mink's 7 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. The City Dfts' 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Summary jgm is granted to all City Dfts on the § 1983 Eighth Amendm ent claim, to the City of Mesa on the § 1983 Fourteenth Amendment claim, and to all City Dfts on the intentional infliction of emotional distress claim, the negligent infliction of emotional distress claim, and the outrage claim. Summary jgm is denied to Stokes, Sorenson, Tarfan, and Doe on the § 1983 Fourteenth Amendment claim. Mink's 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Mink's 31 Motion to Amend is granted. The Clerk shall file the 32 lodged second amended complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/26/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mink v. State of Arizona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?