Moore v. Unknown Parties

Case Number: 2:2009cv02595
Filed: December 11, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's request in his pleading entitled "Account Verification Per Request" re 13 to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/2/10. (TLJ)
June 4, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the Complaint 1 and this action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's Order 8 filed 4/1/10; the Clerk must enter judgment acco rdingly; the docket must reflect that the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24 (a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/4/10.(REW)
April 1, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice the 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a new, completed Application to Proceed In Forma Paup eris and a certified six-month trust account statement from the ADOCs Central Office. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/1/10.(LAD) CHANGED TO WO on 4/2/2010 (MHU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?