Caron et al v. Quickutz Inc.
Case Number: |
2:2009cv02600 |
Filed: |
December 14, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Phoenix Division Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Neil V Wake |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 5, 2013 |
Filing
257
ORDER, QuicKutz's Motion for Exceptional Case Finding and Award of Attorney Fees and Expenses 215 is granted in the amount of $442,620.33; the Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of QuicKutz Inc., in the amount of $442,620.33, plus interest thereon at the rate of 0.17% per annum from the date of judgment until paid. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/4/13.(REW)
|
November 13, 2012 |
Filing
210
ORDER, QuicKutz's Motion for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability Due to Inequitable Conduct 160 , QuicKutz's Motion for Terminating Sanctions Based on Discovery Abuse 164 , and QuicKutz's Motion for Relief Under Rule 56(h) of the Fe deral Rules of Civil Procedure 202 are granted; Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Inadmissible Exhibits and Argument 168 is denied; the Declaration of James Jeffery Caron in Opposition to QuicKutz's Motion for Summary Judgment of Unenforceab ility 172 is ordered stricken; the Clerk shall leave the imaged document in the electronic record; judgment is entered in the form of the separate judgment filed herewith; the Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/13/12. (REW)
|
October 16, 2012 |
Filing
199
ORDER that QuicKutz's Unopposed Motion for Status Conference (Doc. 197 ) is denied as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that QuicKutz's time to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on infringement (Doc. 191 ) is extended to 11/16/12. FURTHER ORDERED setting hearing on QuicKutz's Motion for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability Due to Inequitable Conduct (Doc. 160 ) and QuicKutz's Motion for Terminating Sanctions Based on Discovery Abuse (Doc. 164 ) for 9:30 AM, 11/08/12. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 10/16/12. (NKS)
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
176
ORDER issued re claim construction. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/20/12. (SJF)
|
December 16, 2010 |
Filing
102
ORDER granting Defendant QuicKutz' 74 Renewed Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Outcome of Reexamination Involving Patent No. 7,469,634; this action is stayed pending the PTO's reexamination of the patent-in-suit; the parties shall file a joint status report within 3 business days of any final office action from the PTO; the parties shall submit a joint status report on 3/30/11, if the PTO has issued no final office action by that time. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/15/10.(REW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?