Granillo v. Corrections Corporation of America et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02667
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pla's 17 "Motion to Reinstate Case and Hear PLTF Motion for Protective Orders TRO/PI and Allow PLTF to Retain all Legal Materials at SCC/CCA and Stop Destruction of all PLTF's Needed Legal Material and Order U.S. Marshal Service Process on all Defendants" is denied. This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/15/10. (SAT)
March 24, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Court will take no action on Pla's March 5th and March 10th Letters Docs. # 12 and # 14 . Pla's March 10, 2010 Motion 13 for an extension of time to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause is denied. The Court will cons true the Motion and the attached Declaration as Pla's response to the Order to Show Cause. Pla's February 2, 2010 Application 7 to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is denied. Pla's Complaint Doc. # 1 and this action are dismissed without p rejudice, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). If Pla wishes to reassert these claims in the future, he must prepay the entire $350.00 filing fee when he files his action. Alternatively, he may file a new action and seek leave to proceed in for ma pauperis but must clearly and cogently demonstrate that he is facing imminent danger of serious physical injury at the timehe files his complaint. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/24/10.(KMG)
February 18, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED: Pla is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, why the dismissals of his prior lawsuits does not preclude his in forma pauperis status under § 1915(g). Pla's wr itten response shall be limited to this issue only. Show Cause Response deadline set for 3/19/2010. If Pla fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a response to this Order to Show Cause within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, the Clerk of Court must enter a jgm of dismissal of this action without further notice to Pla and without prejudice to Pla filing a complaint in a new case accompanied by prepayment of the full $350.00 filing fee. Special Prisoner Deadline due by 3/19/2010. Pla's 9 Letter is granted in part to the extent this Order indicates the documents that the Court has received. In all other respects, the Letter is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/17/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granillo v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?