Coleman v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al

Case Number: 2:2009cv02692
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Carrington Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint; and granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Plaintiff shall pay Quality $625.50 within 30 days of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 76 Motion to Reassign Case; denying as moot 80 Motion to Proceed with Case Under Seal; denying as moot 83 Motion for Rule 54(b) determination; and denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and 107 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike; and denying 104 Motion for certification. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/18/10.(LSP)
April 29, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 62 request for clarification on previous ruling is denied. If Plaintiff seeks to file an amended complaint, she shall file a motion pursuant to Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and LRCiv 15.1 by May 21, 2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 04/29/10.(ESL)
March 30, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' motion to dismiss Dkt. # 16 is granted. Defendants' motion to dismiss Dkt. # 31 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration Dkt. # 40 is denied. Plaintiff's application for default judgment Dkt. # 47 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/29/10.(KMG)
February 17, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Expedited Discovery; denying Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Sanctions against Defendants; denying Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/16/10.(REW)
February 4, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Coleman's 23 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/4/10.(LAD)
January 7, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying motion for expedited review of the motion for a temporary restraining order 10 ; Hearing set as to 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2010 at 10:00AM before Judge David G Campbell. (See document for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/10. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?