Gutierrez v. Corrections Corporation of America et al

Plaintiff: Raymond V Gutierrez
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America, Muriel Powers, Justin Roberts and J Ozborne-Barrett
Case Number: 2:2010cv00117
Filed: January 20, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's claim is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies.The Clerk must enter judgment of dismissal and terminate the action. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/18/11.(LSP)
May 16, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Within 14 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file a supplemental response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, together with copies of grievances, sworn declarations, or other admissible evidence. (Doc. 20 ) Def endant may file a supplemental reply within 5 days after service of Plaintiff's supplemental response. The Motion to Dismiss will be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a supplemental reply. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/16/11. (SAT)
November 16, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - IT IS ORDERED Counts I and III and Dfts De Rosa, Chase, Tapia, Schomig, Miller, Seidl, Powers, Roberts, Delsordi, Mayberry, Young, and Allridge Williams are dismissed without prejudice. Dft Corrections Corporation of America must answer Count II. The Clerk of Court must send Pla a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 16 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dft Corrections Corporation of America. Pla must complete and ret urn the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. If Pla does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and First Amended Complaint on a Dft within 120 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Dft not served. Dft must answer the First Amended Complaint (doc. 16 ) or otherwise respond by appropriate motio n within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/15/10. (SAT)
June 15, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla's motion 9 for an extension of time is granted to the extent stated herein. Pla is granted an additional 30 days from the filing date of this Order in which to comply with the Court's May 13, 2010 Order, doc.# 7 . If Pla fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/15/10.(KMG)
May 13, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Raymond V. Gutierrez. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/12/10. (DMT)
January 21, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case is severed into individual actions, one for each pla. The Clerk must assign a new case number to each new individual action. The Clerk must file a copy of the present 1 COMPLAINT and this order in each new case. The individual plas must proceed independently from this point and will not be regarded as co-plas, except upon further order of the Court. All further pleadings, motions or other papers submitted for filing by an individual pla in his separate case must be signed by the individual pla, or they will be stricken. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/15/10. (LAD) (originally filed in 2:09cv2298 on 1/20/10)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond V Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Ozborne-Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?