Montoya v. Dear, et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Paul Montoya
Defendant: R Dear and Michael McCarville
Case Number: 2:2010cv00193
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 8/6/10.(KMG)
April 9, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 04/08/10.(ESL)
March 25, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 3/24/10.(LSP)
March 22, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Carlos Paul Montoya. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/22/10. (KMG)
March 11, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Pla's 3 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Counts II and III and Dfts Franco, Larson, Havelock, and Ryan are dismissed without prejudice. Dfts Dear and McCarville must answer Count I of the Complaint. T he Clerk of Court must send Pla a service packet including the 1 Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dfts Dear and McCarville. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan for all pretrial proceedings authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 03/09/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya v. Dear, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Paul Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Dear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McCarville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?