Phillips v. Moller, et al

Plaintiff: James Earl Phillips
Defendant: Mykel Moller, Matthew Morgan, Jared Lowe, Jimmy Wing and Robert Ryan
Case Number: 2:2010cv00235
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Cochise
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 38 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 45 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's second amended complaint 19 is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk will please close this case. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/13/11.(TLJ)
August 16, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's July 12, 2010 Motion for Extension of Time 17 is granted to the extent that Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint. The Motion is denied with respect to all other relief requested. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28:1915(g)Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/10/10.(TLJ)
April 20, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pla's 13 Motion to Amend Complaint is denied. Pla has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with the 3/8/2010 screening Order. If Pla fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a jgm of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 4/16/10. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Moller, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mykel Moller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Earl Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?