United States of America v. $79,010.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $79,010.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Quezon S Gray
Case Number: 2:2010cv00244
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the government's motion for summary judgment 52 is granted. The government's motion to strike Claimant Quezon S. Gray's statement of facts and exhibits 58 is denied. Gray's "motion to dismiss, reply in support of motion for summary judgment, objections and motion to strike, also Government's motion for summary judgment" 59 is denied. Gray's motion for leave to amend his statement of facts 60 is granted. The Clerk is directed to issue a judgment in this matter. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/4/12.(DMT)
November 14, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Claimant's "Supplement to Motion to Suppress Disclaimer of Ownership of U.S. Currency" 47 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/14/11. (DMT)
July 5, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Claimant's Motion to suppress the disclaimer ; denying as moot 42 Claimant's Motion to suppress the officer's affidavit ; denying as moot 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the motion at (Doc. 42). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/1/11.(DMT)
April 4, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/4/11.(KMG)
March 17, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that the government's motion to strike the answer and claim 25 is denied. Claimant's motion to dismiss the motion to strike 27 is denied as moot. The government's motion to strike the motion to dismiss 29 is denied as mo ot. Claimant's motion to address the Court in lay terms 32 is denied as moot. The government's motion to stay 35 is denied as moot. The government shall file a response to Claimant's motion to suppress within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/17/11. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $79,010.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Wendy L Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $79,010.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Quezon S Gray
Represented By: Antonio Rodriguez Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?