Pauline v. Loos et al

Plaintiff: Frank Pauline, Jr
Defendant: Chris Loos, Rick Castberg, Avon Books and Harpercollins Publishing
Case Number: 2:2010cv00248
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Plaintiff's August 24, 2011 Letter. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/6/11. (LSP)
July 21, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT and this action are dismissed without prejudice for improper venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b). (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/20/10. (LAD)
June 15, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff has 15 days to file a first amended complaint in compliance with the 5/4/10 Order; if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 15 days, the Clerk must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/10.(REW)
May 24, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plainitff's "Clarification" 10 , which the Court construes as a motion for reconsideration of the screening Order, is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/24/10. (TLJ)
March 31, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/31/10.(DMT) Modified on 3/31/2010 (JEMB TO INDICATE WO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauline v. Loos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Pauline, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Castberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Books
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpercollins Publishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?