Dixon v. Pinal, County of, et al

Plaintiff: Mark E Dixon
Defendant: Bryan Martyn, Pinal, County of, James Walsh, Paul Babeu, Pete Rios and David Snider
Case Number: 2:2010cv00325
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 122 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/11/12.(TLJ)
July 7, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 107 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/7/11.(LAD)
January 11, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part as set forth in this order 61 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The deadlines set forth in the case management order dated 10/13/10 (Doc. 57) remain in effect. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/11/11.(TLJ)
January 7, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/7/11.(TLJ)
June 14, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pla's 26 Motion to Dismiss Party/Dfts. Defendants David Snider, Bryan Martyn and Pete Rios are dismissed. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for August 6, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. (Dkt. #29). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/14/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Pinal, County of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Martyn
Represented By: Joe A Albo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinal, County of
Represented By: Joe A Albo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walsh
Represented By: Joe A Albo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Babeu
Represented By: Joe A Albo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Rios
Represented By: Joe A Albo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Snider
Represented By: Joe A Albo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?