DLC Dermacare LLC v. Castillo et al
Plaintiff: DLC Dermacare LLC
Defendant: Dominic Moffo, Douglas Keverline, Gregory M Johnson, Marc A Wilson, Guatam Samaddar, Kim D Moffo, Alison Moffo, Jeffery E Epstein, Anjana Samaddar, Gary K Goforth, Thomas Moffo, Fox Development Company, Nohemi Nafe, Michelle Barnes, Quality Skincare LLC, Skip Moffo, Kudlip Thusu, Charles H. Goforth Revocable Trust, Susan Feng, Unknown Parties, Renea D Jain, Suneil Jain, Amir Hussain, Brian L Fox, Ramen Verma, James E Fox, Perfect Image LLC, Anshu Jain, Tommi R Goforth, Johnathon Munoz, Jeff Barson, Latha Johnson, Gary K. Goforth Trust, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan A Epstein, Abraham Sayegh, Shannon C Fox, Christina Sayegh, Southside Development LLC, Scott Gulbranson, Teri L Goforth, Steven M Goforth, Daniel P McDonald, Irum Hussain, Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, John Johnson, Lisa Vanbockern, Charles H Goforth, Nora Jain, Shannon Maltais, Roger Stratt, Sixta Castillo, Theresa Gulbranson, Timothy Bode, David M Minozzi and Babak Nafe
Petitioner: Carl J Mudd
Trustee: Robert A Mackenzie
Case Number: 2:2010cv00333
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2013 Filing 256 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Barnes. Reason for return: Insufficient address. Document number 255. (KMG)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER This action is dismissed for lack of prosecution. Mr. Mudd's motion for substitution (Doc. #244 ) is denied. The motion to disqualify counsel (Doc. #249 ) is denied as moot and because Dermacare cannot appear through a non-lawyer in this Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/8/2012.(KMG)
September 24, 2012 Filing 254 NOTICE of Change of Address by DLC Dermacare LLC, Carl J Mudd: 1776 N Scottsdale Rd., #1264, Scottsdale, AZ 85252. (KMG)
September 19, 2012 Filing 253 NOTICE re of Filing Exhibit 1 by James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company, Lisa Vanbockern re #252 Response to Motion, Exhibit 1 to Defendants Lisa Vanbockern's, Fox Development Company's, James E. Fox's and Shannon C. Fox's Response to Plaintiff's Motiont ot Disqualify Counsel Filed September 19, 2012 at Document No. 252. (Merrett, Andre)
September 19, 2012 Filing 252 RESPONSE to Motion re #249 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Defendants Lisa Vanbockern's, Fox Development Company's, James E. Fox's and Shannon C. Fox's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company, Lisa Vanbockern. (Merrett, Andre)
September 7, 2012 Filing 251 RESPONSE (Note: Document is entitled "Response to Defendants Response and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute") to Motion re #247 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Carl J Mudd. (NOTE: 2 Part Pleading, Same PDF as Doc.#250) (KMG)
September 7, 2012 Filing 250 REPLY to Response to Motion re #244 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Carl J Mudd. (Note: Document is entitled "Response to Defendants Response and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute") (KMG)
September 7, 2012 Filing 249 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Carl J Mudd. (KMG)
August 31, 2012 Filing 248 *RESPONSE to Motion re #244 MOTION to Substitute Party: filed by Jeff Barson. (Jones, Fredrick) *Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - text searchability; Attorney notified on 8/31/2012 (KMG).
August 30, 2012 Filing 247 *RESPONSE to Motion re #244 MOTION to Substitute Party: Defendants Lisa Vanbockern's, Fox Development Company's, James E. Fox's and Shannon C. Fox's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution of Parties and MOTION to Dimiss Case for Failure to Prosecute Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (b) filed by James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company, Lisa Vanbockern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Merrett, Andre) *Modified to Add Motion to Dismiss on 8/31/2012 (KMG).
August 21, 2012 Filing 246 NOTICE of Change of Address by DLC Dermacare LLC, Carl J Mudd: DLC Dermacare LLC, c/o Carl Mudd, 15440 N 71st, Suite 109, Scottsdale, AZ 85254. (KMG)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER (re #244 Motion to Substitute Party) On or before August 31, 2012, defense counsel shall file a response to the motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/17/12. (MAP)
August 16, 2012 Filing 244 RULE 25 MOTION to Substitute Party by Carl J Mudd. (MAP)
July 31, 2012 Filing 243 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Barnes. Reason for return: No such number, unable to forward. Document number 239. (BAH)
July 30, 2012 Filing 242 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DLC Dermacare LLC c/o Carl Mudd. Reason for return: Vacant. Document number 240. (KMG)
July 30, 2012 Filing 241 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to these proceedings by Juan Castillo-Plaza. (KMG)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER The motion to withdraw filed by counsel for Plaintiff DLC Dermacare, LLC (Doc. #220 ) is granted. Andr E. Carman and the law firm of Warnock, MacKinlay & Carman, PLLC is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Plaintiff DLC Dermacare, LLC shall have until noon on August 17, 2012, to retain new counsel. If counsel for Plaintiff does appear by noon on August 17, 2012, the new Plaintiff's counsel shall file a memorandum on or before August 24, 2012, explaining why Plaintiff may pursue the claim in this case after abandonment of the claim by the bankruptcy trustee. The motion recently filed by Mr. Mudd (Doc. #238 ) is denied because DLC Dermacare, LLC cannot appear through a non-lawyer. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/23/2012. (See PDF for full details.)(KMG)
July 19, 2012 Filing 239 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Status Conference held on 7/19/2012. ORDERED taking under advisement #220 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; taking under advisement #238 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Court will issue an order. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.)(TCA)
July 18, 2012 Filing 238 MOTION for Extension of Time re July 19th Scheduling Conference by prose filer Carl Mudd (Principal for Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC.) (KMG)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to waive appearance and request for entry of order granting motion to withdraw (Doc. #234 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The Court will deny Plaintiff's counsel's request to waive his appearance at the status conference and will deny the request to enter an order granting withdrawal of counsel at this time. Counsel for Plaintiff DLC Dermacare shall be permitted to appear at the status conference telephonically. Counsel for Plaintiff shall call the Court no later than 1:55 p.m. on July 19, 2012 to be connected to the status conference. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/2012.(KMG)
July 16, 2012 Filing 236 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andre E Carman. (Carman, Andre)
July 13, 2012 Filing 235 *Additional Attachment to Main Document re: #234 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion to Waive Appearance of Counsel; Request for Entry of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Carman, Andre) *Modified to correct event on 7/16/2012 (KMG).
July 13, 2012 Filing 234 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion to Waive Appearance of Counsel; Request for Entry of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Carman, Andre)
July 2, 2012 Filing 233 NOTICE re Abandonment by the Chapter 7 Trustee by Robert A Mackenzie . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Bankruptcy Court Abandonment Notice)(Rodgers, Stuart)
July 2, 2012 Filing 232 NOTICE re to Court Regarding Plaintiff Representation by DLC Dermacare LLC . (Carman, Andre)
June 18, 2012 Filing 231 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Barnes. Reason for return: Insufficient Address. Document number 228. (KMG)
June 15, 2012 Filing 230 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Barnes. Reason for return: Insufficient Address Unable to Forward. Document number 229. (KMG)
June 5, 2012 Filing 229 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Final Pretrial Conference not held on 6/5/2012. ORDERED taking under advisement until 7/2/2012 #220 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneyfor plaintiff Andre Carman. Status Conference set for 7/19/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. (see minute entry for details) (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.)(TCA)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER that the motion to vacate hearing (Doc. #225 ) is denied. The Final Pretrial Hearing in this case will be held as scheduled on June 5, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. before the Honorable David G. Campbell, 401 West Washington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/4/2012.(KMG)
June 1, 2012 Filing 227 *Response to Trustee's MOTION to Vacate June 8th Hearing by DLC Dermacare LLC re #225 Notice (Other) . (Carman, Andre) *Modified to correct event on 6/4/2012 (KMG).
June 1, 2012 Filing 226 *Additional Attachment to Main Document re #225 MOTION to Vacate June 8th Hearing by Robert A Mackenzie. (Rodgers, Stuart) *Modified to correct event on 6/4/2012 (KMG).
June 1, 2012 Filing 225 *NOTICE re Appearance and MOTION to Vacate June 8th Hearing by Robert A Mackenzie . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order Converting Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case)(Rodgers, Stuart) *Modified to include motion on 6/4/2012 (KMG).
May 31, 2012 Filing 224 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andre Harbon Merrett. (Merrett, Andre)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference set for June 8, 2012 at 4:00 p.m. is vacated and reset as follows: Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 6/5/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Plaintiff DLC Dermacare, LLC, Andre E. Carman, Mr. Carl Mudd, pro se Defendants and counsel for Defendants shall appear in person. Mr. Carman shall notify Mr. Mudd of his required attendance at the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/31/2012. (KMG)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER that counsel for Plaintiff DLC Dermacare, LLC, Andre E. Carman, Mr. Carl Mudd, pro se Defendants and counsel for Defendants shall appear in person at the Final Pretrial Conference set for June 8, 2011 at 4:00 p.m. before the Honorable David G. Campbell, 401 West Washington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, Arizona. Mr. Carman shall notify Mr. Mudd of his required attendance at the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/24/2012. (KMG)
May 17, 2012 Filing 221 *Additional Attachment (Proposed Order) to Main Document re: #220 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record and Certification of Counsel re Same by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Carman, Andre) *Modified to correct event on 5/18/2012 (KMG).
May 17, 2012 Filing 220 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record and Certification of Counsel re Same by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Carman, Andre)
April 23, 2012 Filing 219 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Barnes. Reason for return: Insufficient Address. Document number 218. (KMG)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER - Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2012 no later than 4:00 p.m. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge David G Campbell. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/11/12. (LAD)
January 13, 2012 Filing 217 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to S. Castillo. Reason for return: insufficient adddress, unable to forward. Document number 214. (DMT)
January 13, 2012 Filing 216 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to M. Barnes. Reason for return: undeliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Document number 214. (DMT)
January 13, 2012 Filing 215 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to J. Castillo-Plaza. Reason for return: insufficient address, unable to forward. Document number 214. (DMT)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting the #213 Stipulated Motion to Substitute Attorney. Andrew E Carman is substituted as counsel for the Plaintiff; Ben J Himmelstein, Matthew A Klopp and Adam Stafford shall be removed as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/4/12.(REW)
December 16, 2011 Filing 213 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Stipulated) by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Carman, Andre)
November 28, 2011 Filing 212 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Barnes. Reason for return: No Such Number, Unable to Forward. Document number 209. (KMG)
November 28, 2011 Filing 211 ANSWER to #184 Amended Complaint by James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company.(Merrett, Andre)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER that Fox Defendants' motion to dismiss Doc. #199 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/18/2011.(KMG)
November 18, 2011 Filing 210 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Barnes. Reason for return: Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward. Document number 208 . (LAD)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER. Fox Defendants' motion for extension of time #201 is granted. This case, although pending for some time, is still in the discovery stage. The Fox Defendants have only recently appeared and filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment #192 is denied without prejudice to re-filing on the dispositive motion deadline. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/7/2011. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVO)
November 1, 2011 Filing 207 NOTICE re OF SERVICE OF ITS FIRST SET OF NON-UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES AND ITS FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO LISA VANBOCKERN by DLC Dermacare LLC . (Himmelstein, Ben)
November 1, 2011 Filing 206 RESPONSE to Motion re #201 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #189 Motion for Summary Judgment agsainst Defendants Sixta Castillo, R.N. and Juan Castillo-Plaza, M.D. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/31/11.(SJF)
October 31, 2011 Filing 204 NOTICE re OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF NON-UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by DLC Dermacare LLC . (Himmelstein, Ben)
October 27, 2011 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re #199 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Fox Development Company's, James E. Fox's and Shannon C. Fox's Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Merrett, Andre)
October 19, 2011 Filing 202 RESPONSE to Motion re #199 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben)
October 18, 2011 Filing 201 * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #192 MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Fox Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) by James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Merrett, Andre) *Modified to correct event and to add document number on 10/20/2011 (SAT).
October 7, 2011 Filing 200 STATUS REPORT Re: Settlement Discussions by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben)
October 5, 2011 Filing 199 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants by James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Merrett, Andre) Modified on 10/6/2011 this document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - text searchability. Attorney Noticed. (KMG).
September 30, 2011 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre Harbon Merrett on behalf of James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company (Merrett, Andre)
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER that Defendants Sixta Castillo and Juan Castillo-Plaza must file a response to Plaintiff's Motion re #189 for Summary Judgment, together with a separate Statement of Facts and supporting affidavits or other appropriate exhibits, no later than October 7, 2011. Plaintiff may file a reply within 15 days after service of Defendants' response. The Motion for Summary Judgment will be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/2011. (KMG)
September 6, 2011 Filing 196 NOTICE re of Service of NUIs by DLC Dermacare LLC . (Himmelstein, Ben)
September 6, 2011 Filing 195 NOTICE re of Service of RFP by DLC Dermacare LLC . (Himmelstein, Ben)
September 6, 2011 Filing 194 NOTICE re Notice of Service of NUI by DLC Dermacare LLC . (Himmelstein, Ben)
September 6, 2011 Filing 193 *STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Motion re #192 MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Fox Defendants by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben) Modified on 9/7/2011 to correct event "Statement", to include document relationship. Duplicate Motion Termed.* (KMG).
September 6, 2011 Filing 192 MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Fox Defendants by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben)
August 18, 2011 Filing 191 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Barnes. Reason for return: No Such Number, Unable to Forward. Document number 183. (JRD)
July 21, 2011 Filing 190 *Statement of Facts in Support of Motion re: #189 First MOTION for Summary Judgment against Sixta Castillo, R.N. and Juan Castillo-Plaza, M.D. by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Himmelstein, Ben) *Modified on 7/22/2011 to correct event "Statement." Motion termed.* (KMG).
July 21, 2011 Filing 189 First MOTION for Summary Judgment against Sixta Castillo, R.N. and Juan Castillo-Plaza, M.D. by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben)
July 19, 2011 Filing 188 NOTICE re of Service of Requests for Production by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben)
July 19, 2011 Filing 187 NOTICE re of Service of Non-Uniform Interrogatories by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben)
July 14, 2011 Filing 186 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Juan Castillo-Plaza. Reason for return: Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward. Document number 183. (MHA)
July 14, 2011 Filing 185 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sixta Castillo. Reason for return: Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to forward. Document number 183. (MHA)
July 13, 2011 Filing 184 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Himmelstein, Ben)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER, granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #182 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiff shall have until 7/15/11 to file a second amended complaint consistent with this order; each individual or entity properly named as a Defendant shall be specifically listed in the caption of the complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/7/11.(REW)
June 3, 2011 Filing 182 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Klopp, Matthew)
May 26, 2011 Filing 181 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeff Barson.(Jones, Fredrick)
May 9, 2011 Filing 180 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (54b) IN A CIVIL CASE - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED by way of this Court, dismissing defendants Kuldip Thusu and Raman Verma with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 54(b). There being no just reason for delay, judgment is entered dismissing these defendants. (KMG)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #175 Stipulation of Dismissal: that the action is dismissed as to Defendants Kuldip Thusu and Raman Verma, with prejudice; FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all of the claims and causes of action that were brought in the action or that were required to have been brought in the action are dismissed, as to Defendants Kuldip Thusu and Raman Verma, with prejudice; FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs; and FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that there is no just reason for delay and the Court directs the entry of this Order pursuant to Rule 54 Fed.R.Civ.P. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/9/11. (KMG)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER - Defendant Jeff Barson's motion to set aside default (Doc. 166) is granted. The Clerk is directed to set aside Defendant Barsons default entered on May 25, 2010 (Doc. 153). Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. 166) is denied without prejudice. Defendant shall have until May 27, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Except with respect to the deadline for making initial disclosures, Defendant is bound by the schedule set forth in the case management order dated April 4, 2011 (Doc. 174). The parties shall exchange initial disclosures within 15 days after the filing of an answer or a ruling on a motion to dismiss (if not granted). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/6/11.(KMG)
April 29, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE re Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure Statement by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Stafford, Adam)
April 29, 2011 Filing 176 *NOTICE re of Service of Defendant Lisa Vanbockern's Rule 26 (a) Initial Disclosure Statement by Lisa Vanbockern. (Merrett, Andre) Modified on 5/2/2011 *Document is filed with incorrect case number. Attorney Noticed.* (KMG).
April 28, 2011 Filing 175 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Kudlip Thusu, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 12/16/2011. Dispositive motions due by 1/27/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/4/11. (LMR)
April 1, 2011 Filing 173 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: Adam Stafford for plaintiff; Andre Merrett and Geoffrey Kercsmar for defendants. Scheduling Conference held on 4/1/2011. Separate case management order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
March 28, 2011 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re #166 Second MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Stafford, Adam) Modified on 3/28/2011 document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - text searchability. Attorney Noticed. (KMG).
March 25, 2011 Filing 171 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben)
March 23, 2011 Filing 170 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Robert Stalnaker Reder, counsel for Defendant Susan A Epstein (Reder, Robert)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER - Upon Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC's #162 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, IT IS ORDERED that Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC, Geoffrey S Kercsmar, Gregory B Collins, and Jenessa G B Coccaro are permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Juan Castillo-Plaza, Sixta Castillo and Michelle Barnes. FURTHER ORDERED that Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC shall send a copy of this Order to Juan Castillo-Plaza, Sixta Castillo and Michelle Barnes. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/11. (SAT)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER - Upon Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC's #161 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, IT IS ORDERED that Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC, Geoffrey S Kercsmar, Gregory B Collins, and Jenessa G B Coccaro are permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Susan Feng, Amir Farooqui, Irum Hussain and David Minozzi. FURTHER ORDERED that Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC shall send a copy of this Order to Susan Feng, Amir Farooqui, Irum Hussain and David Minozzi. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/11. (SAT)
March 21, 2011 Filing 167 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re #163 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Kudlip Thusu and Raman Verma by Defendants Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Kudlip Thusu, Ramen Verma. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
March 14, 2011 Filing 166 Second MOTION to Set Aside Default and MOTION to Dismiss Case by Jeff Barson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Fredrick). Modified on 3/15/2011 to Add MOTION to Dismiss Case. (KMG).
March 14, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Fredrick Martin Jones on behalf of Jeff Barson (Jones, Fredrick)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying without prejudice #150 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/8/2011.(NVO)
March 3, 2011 Filing 163 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Kudlip Thusu and Raman Verma by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Kudlip Thusu, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
March 3, 2011 Filing 162 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Juan Castillo-Plaza, Sixta Castillo, and Michelle Barnes by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Kudlip Thusu, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
March 3, 2011 Filing 161 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Susan Feng, Amir Farooqui (Hussain), Irum Hussain, and David Minozzi by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Kudlip Thusu, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER - Defendant Barson shall have until March 18, 2011 to serve on Plaintiff and file with the Court a new motion to set aside the entry of default. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/1/11. (KMG)
February 22, 2011 Filing 159 APPLICATION re: Application for Default Judgment Against Defendant Jeff Barson by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Stafford, Adam)
February 22, 2011 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Allen Klopp, Ben Joshua Himmelstein by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Himmelstein, Ben) Modified on 2/23/2011 CORRECTION: to correct event and to add attorney(s). (KMG).
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/15/2011. (NVO)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER - (1) the Motion for Leave to Substitute Counsel (Doc. 155) is granted; and (2) the law firm of Rolfe Stafford, PLLC is substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff DLC DERMACARE LLC in place of the law firm Udall Law Firm, LLP. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/8/11.(KMG)
February 1, 2011 Filing 155 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and For Leave to Substitute Counsel by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Redmon, Ryan)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER - Defendants' motion to dismiss pending arbitration (Doc. 148) is granted. Plaintiff and Defendants Gautam and Anjana Samadder and John and Latha Johnson are directed to comply with the mediation and arbitration provisions set forth in the relevant franchise agreement. See Doc. 114-1. The claims asserted against Defendants Gautam and Anjana Samadder and John and Latha Johnson are dismissed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/27/11.(KMG)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. Defendant Barson's request that his default be set aside for good cause is denied without prejudice. Defendant Barson shall have until 2/11/2011 to serve Plaintiff and file with the Court a new motion to set aside the entry of default. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/27/2011. (NVO)
January 12, 2011 Filing 152 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #147 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Johnson and Sammader by DLC Dermacare LLC.(Redmon, Ryan)
December 28, 2010 Filing 151 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Kudlip Thusu, Ramen Verma.(Collins, Gregory)
December 28, 2010 Filing 150 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees by Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Timothy Bode, Anshu Jain, Nora Jain, Johnathon Munoz. (Thomas, Richard)
December 23, 2010 Filing 149 RESPONSE re #127 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,, and Barson's 11-2-10 Answer and Motion to Set Aside by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Redmon, Ryan)
December 22, 2010 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss Party Gautam Samadder, Anjana Samadder, John Johnson & Latha Johnson by John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Anjana Samaddar, Guatam Samaddar or to Stay pending arbitration. (Banks, James). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/23/2010 (DMT).
December 22, 2010 Filing 147 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand AND, COUNTERCLAIM against DLC Dermacare LLC by John Johnson, Guatam Samaddar, Latha Johnson, Anjana Samaddar.(Banks, James)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER - The request for substitution of counsel (Doc. 119) is granted. The law firm of Thomas Schern Richardson, PLLC is substituted as counsel of record for Anshu Jain and Nora Jain in place of the law firm of Gabriel & Ashworth, PLLC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/10.(KMG)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #74 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting in part and denying in part #112 Motion to Compel Arbitration and granting in part and denying in part #114 Motion to Dismiss Party; granted as to Defendants: Johnathan Munoz (named in the complaint as Jonathon Munoz), Michele Connor, Timothy Bode, Bobbie Bode Theresa Gulbranson, Scott Gulbranson, Quality Skincare, LLC, Charles Goforth, the Charles H. Goforth Charitable Trust, Steven Goforth, Teri Goforth, Marc Wilson, Daniel McDonald, Anshu Jain, and Nora Jain and denied as to Defendant Lisa Vanbockern. See PDF document for details. The claims asserted against moving Defendants other than Lisa Vanbockern are dismissed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/10.(LSP)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #108 Defendants Latha Johnson, John Johnson, Anjana Samadder, and Gautam Samadder Motion to Set Aside Default; denying #108 Alternative Motion to Dismiss; and Defendants shall have until December 23, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/10.(LSP)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying #107 Defendant Kudlip Thusu's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #107 and #133 Motion to Dismiss, see PDF document for details, and denying #134 Defendants Susan Feng, Amir Hussain (Amir Farooqui), Irum Hussain, David Minozzi, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Sixta Castillo, and Michelle Barnes' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/10.(LSP)
December 6, 2010 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re #134 MOTION to Dismiss Party Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David Minozzi, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Sixta Castillo and Michelle Barnes filed by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi. (Collins, Gregory)
December 6, 2010 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kudlip Thusu Under Rule 12(B)(5) and Rule 12(B)(6) and Reply in Support of Joinder in Dr. Kudlip Thusu's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Ramen Verma. (Collins, Gregory)
November 24, 2010 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #134 MOTION to Dismiss Party Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David Minozzi, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Sixta Castillo and Michelle Barnes filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Redmon, Ryan)
November 24, 2010 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kudlip Thusu Under Rule 12(B)(5) and Rule 12(B)(6) (NAMELY, Response to DOC 133 Ramen Verma's JOINDER to Doc 107) filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Redmon, Ryan)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting the #135 Stipulation: Granting Plaintiff until and through November 24, 2010 to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 134). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/12/10. (KMG)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting the #136 Stipulation: Granting Plaintiff until and through November 24, 2010 to file a response to Defendant Ramen Verma's Joinder Re: Motion to Dismiss Kudlip Thusu (Docket No. 133). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/12/10. (KMG)
November 9, 2010 Filing 136 STIPULATION re #133 to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Ramen Verma's Joinder Re Motion to Dismiss Kudlip Thusu by DLC Dermacare LLC, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redmon, Ryan) Modified on 11/10/2010 (KMG).
November 9, 2010 Filing 135 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond re #134 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, DLC Dermacare LLC, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redmon, Ryan) Modified on 11/10/2010 as to text. (KMG).
October 29, 2010 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss Party Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David Minozzi, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Sixta Castillo and Michelle Barnes by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi. (Collins, Gregory)
October 29, 2010 Filing 133 Joinder re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kudlip Thusu Under Rule 12(B)(5) and Rule 12(B)(6) and Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) by Defendant Ramen Verma. (Collins, Gregory)
October 29, 2010 Filing 132 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Kudlip Thusu, Ramen Verma. (Collins, Gregory)
October 25, 2010 Filing 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kudlip Thusu Under Rule 12(B)(5) and Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Kudlip Thusu. (Collins, Gregory)
October 25, 2010 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re #108 MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for Leave to File Answer Instanter filed by John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Anjana Samaddar, Guatam Samaddar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Johnson, #2 Affidavit of Gautam Samadder, #3 Exhibit Dermacare Circular, #4 Exhibit Franklin America v. Franklin Cast Products)(Banks, James)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Plaintiff's motions for default judgment against Defendants John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Guatam Samadder, and Anjana Samadder (Docs. 101, 102, 103, 104) are denied without prejudice. The Court will address the motion to set aside the entry of default (Doc. 108) once it is fully briefed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/10.(KMG)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER The motion to set aside entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(c) filed by Defendants Susan Feng, Amir Hussain (Amir Farooqui), Irum Hussain, David Minozzi, Ramen Verma, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Sixta Castillo, and Michelle Barnes (Doc. 60) is granted. Defendants shall have until October 29, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/10.(KMG)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against Jeff Barson (Doc. 85) and motion to strike his answer (Doc. 86) are denied without prejudice. Defendant Jeff Barson shall have until November 5, 2010 to file a motion to set aside the entry of default for good cause pursuant to Rule 55(c). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/10.(KMG)
October 18, 2010 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #114 MOTION to Dismiss Party Anshu Jain and Nora Jain or to Stay Pending Arbitration Proceeding by Defendants Anshu Jain, Nora Jain. (Thomas, Richard) Modified on 10/19/2010 CORRECTION: To correct event. (KMG).
October 18, 2010 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Charles H. Goforth Revocable Trust, Charles H Goforth, Steven M Goforth, Teri L Goforth, Scott Gulbranson, Theresa Gulbranson, Daniel P McDonald, Quality Skincare LLC, Marc A Wilson. (Merrett, Andre) Modified on 10/19/2010 CORRECTION: To Correct Document Linkage. (KMG).
October 18, 2010 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #108 MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for Leave to File Answer Instanter filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)(Redmon, Ryan)
October 18, 2010 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION for Default Judgment as to John Johnson, #102 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Latha Johnson, #104 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Anjana Samadder, #103 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Guatam Samadder filed by John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Anjana Samaddar, Guatam Samaddar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Setting Aside Default & Granting Leave to File Answer)(Banks, James) Modified on 10/19/2010 CORRECTION: Document is not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Title Page, ALSO Document was incorrectly linked to Document 108, the linkage and text have been removed(KMG).
October 15, 2010 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kudlip Thusu Under Rule 12(B)(5) and Rule 12(B)(6) filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Redmon, Ryan)
October 8, 2010 Filing 121 RESPONSE to Motion re #114 MOTION to Dismiss Party Anshu Jain and Nora Jain or to Stay Pending Arbitration Proceeding Opposition filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Redmon, Ryan)
October 4, 2010 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #112 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Redmon, Ryan)
September 28, 2010 Filing 119 MOTION for Attorney Substitution by Richard R Thomas (Thomas, Richard) Modified on 9/29/2010 CORRECTION: To correct event. (KMG).
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER pursuant to #115 Stipulation: Defendants may have until and through October 18, 2010 to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Docket Nos. 101, 102, 103 and 104), and Plaintiff may have until and through October 18, 2010 to respond to the Samaddar and Johnson Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default (Docket No. 108). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/2010. (NVO)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER pursuant to #116 Stipulation: Plaintiff shall file a responsive document to Defendant Thusu's motion to dismiss on or before 10/15/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/2010. (NVO)
September 24, 2010 Filing 116 STIPULATION re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kudlip Thusu Under Rule 12(B)(5) and Rule 12(B)(6) for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Response to Thusu's Motion to Dismiss by DLC Dermacare LLC, Kudlip Thusu. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Akmajian, Peter)
September 24, 2010 Filing 115 STIPULATION re #101 MOTION for Default Judgment as to John Johnson, #108 MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for Leave to File Answer Instanter, #102 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Latha Johnson, #103 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Guatam Samadder, #104 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Anjana Samadder for Extension of Time for Defendants to File REsponse to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and for Plaintiff to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Set Aside Default by DLC Dermacare LLC, John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Anjana Samaddar, Guatam Samaddar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Akmajian, Peter)
September 21, 2010 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss Party Anshu Jain and Nora Jain or to Stay Pending Arbitration Proceeding by Anshu Jain, Nora Jain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Thomas, Richard)
September 20, 2010 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Party Johnathan Munoz, M.D., Michele Connor, Timothy Bode, M.D., and Bobbie Bode filed by Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Timothy Bode, Johnathon Munoz. (Thomas, Richard)
September 17, 2010 Filing 112 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Stay Proceedings by Charles H. Goforth Revocable Trust, Charles H Goforth, Steven M Goforth, Teri L Goforth, Scott Gulbranson, Theresa Gulbranson, Daniel P McDonald, Quality Skincare, LLC, Lisa Vanbockern, Marc A Wilson. (Merrett, Andre) Modified on 9/20/2010 CORRECTION: To Remove Dfts. (KMG).
September 17, 2010 Filing 111 ANSWER to Complaint by Lisa Vanbockern.(Merrett, Andre)
September 17, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ryan W. Redmon appearing for DLC Dermacare LLC. Association of Counsel Within Law Firm (Akmajian, Peter) Modified on 9/20/2010 CORRECTION: Attorney added to the docket. (KMG).
September 14, 2010 Filing 109 LODGED Proposed Answer and Counterclaim re: #108 MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for Leave to File Answer Instanter. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Anjana Samaddar, Guatam Samaddar. (KMG)
September 14, 2010 Filing 108 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment as to Dfts Samadders and Johnsons and/or, MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, and/or MOTION for Leave to File Answer Instanter by John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Anjana Samaddar, Guatam Samaddar. (KMG)
September 14, 2010 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kudlip Thusu Under Rule 12(B)(5) and Rule 12(B)(6) by Kudlip Thusu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Collins, Gregory)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #105 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 14, 2010 Filing 105 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James H Banks on behalf of defendants John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Anjana Samaddar, and Guatam Samaddar. (BAS)
September 14, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX101251 as to James H Banks. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 10, 2010 Filing 104 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Anjana Samadder by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Akmajian, Peter)
September 10, 2010 Filing 103 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Guatam Samadder by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Akmajian, Peter)
September 10, 2010 Filing 102 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Latha Johnson by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Akmajian, Peter)
September 10, 2010 Filing 101 MOTION for Default Judgment as to John Johnson by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Akmajian, Peter)
September 10, 2010 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Party Johnathan Munoz, M.D., Michele Connor, Timothy Bode, M.D., and Bobbie Bode filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Akmajian, Peter)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER pursuant to #98 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Anshu Jain answer due 9/21/2010; Nora Jain answer due 9/21/2010. The parties are advised that the Court will not grant additional extensions absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/9/2010. (NVO)
September 7, 2010 Filing 98 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Anshu Jain, Nora Jain. (Ashworth, Andrew)
September 3, 2010 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) filed by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Collins, Gregory)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #94 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendant Thusu shall respond to the Complaint on or before 9/14/2010. The parties are advised that the Court will not grant further extensions absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/2/2010. (NVO)(NVO)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #92 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall file their response to motion to dismiss on or before 9/10/2010. The parties are advised that no further extensions will be granted absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/2/2010. (NVO)
September 1, 2010 Filing 94 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Kudlip Thusu. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Time for Defendant M.D. Kuldip Thusu to Respond to Complaint)(Collins, Gregory)
September 1, 2010 Filing 93 Additional Attachments (Proposed Judgment) to Main Document re: #85 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeff Barson by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment)(Akmajian, Peter) Modified on 9/2/2010 CORRECTION: To correct Event.(KMG).
September 1, 2010 Filing 92 STIPULATION re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Party Johnathan Munoz, M.D., Michele Connor, Timothy Bode, M.D., and Bobbie Bode by Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Timothy Bode, DLC Dermacare LLC, Johnathon Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Akmajian, Peter)
September 1, 2010 Filing 90 SET ASIDE by (Doc. 144). Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John Johnson, Guatam Samaddar. (KMG) Modified on 12/14/2010 (LSP).
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER pursuant to #82 Stipulation, Defendants Feng, Farooqui, Hussain, Minozzi, Verma, Castillo-Plaza, Castillo, and Barnes shall file their reply in support of motion to set aside entry of default on or before 9/6/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/31/2010. (NVO)
August 31, 2010 Filing 88 RETURN of Service Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. NORA JAIN served on 8/17/2010 (Akmajian, Peter) Modified on 9/1/2010 CORRECTION: To correct event. (KMG).
August 31, 2010 Filing 87 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. ANSHU JAIN served on 8/17/2010 (Akmajian, Peter) Modified on 9/1/2010 CORRECTION: To correct event. (KMG).
August 30, 2010 Filing 86 MOTION to Strike #57 Answer to Complaint by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Akmajian, Peter)
August 30, 2010 Filing 85 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeff Barson by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Akmajian, Peter)
August 30, 2010 Filing 84 NOTICE re of Filing Affidavits of Service Re Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Against Defendants John Johnson and Guatam Samadder by DLC Dermacare LLC re Remark (Public), Remark (Public). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter)
August 27, 2010 Filing 83 SET ASIDE by (Doc. 144). Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to dfts Latha Johnson, and Anjana Samaddar. (KMG) Modified on 12/14/2010 (LSP).
August 27, 2010 Filing 82 STIPULATION re #60 MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Their Reply in Support of Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(c))(Collins, Gregory)
August 27, 2010 Remark - As to Entry of Default against Dfts John Johnson and Guatam Samaddar, no return of service/affidavit of service found on the docket for these two dfts, therefore default cannot be entered. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KMG)
August 26, 2010 Filing 81 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC against Latha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Request to Clerk to Enter Default Against Latha Johnson)(Akmajian, Peter)
August 26, 2010 Filing 80 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC against Anjana Samaddar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request to Clerk to Enter Default against Anjana Samaddar)(Akmajian, Peter)
August 26, 2010 Filing 79 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC against Guatam Samaddar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request to Clerk to Enter Default Against Guatam Samaddar)(Akmajian, Peter)
August 26, 2010 Filing 78 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC against John Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant John Johnson)(Akmajian, Peter)
August 25, 2010 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DLC Dermacare LLC re #1 Complaint,,,. Dft Kudlip Thusa, M.D. served 8/11/2010 (SMBE)
August 20, 2010 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Akmajian, Peter)
August 17, 2010 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss Party Johnathan Munoz, M.D., Michele Connor, Timothy Bode, M.D., and Bobbie Bode by Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Timothy Bode, Johnathon Munoz. (Thomas, Richard)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER pursuant to #70 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Johnathon Munoz answer due 8/17/2010, Michele Connor, Bobbie Bode answer due 8/17/2010. The parties are advised that the Court will not grant further extensions to this deadline absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/17/2010. (NVO)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER pursuant to #71 Stipulation: Plaintiff shall have until 8/20/2010 to respond to motion to set aside entry of default. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/17/2010. (NVO)
August 13, 2010 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Anjana Samaddar served on 8/4/2010. (KMG)
August 13, 2010 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Latha Johnson served on 8/4/2010. (KMG)
August 12, 2010 Filing 71 STIPULATION re #60 MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) to Extend Time for Plaintiff to File Response by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, DLC Dermacare LLC, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Akmajian, Peter)
August 10, 2010 Filing 70 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Timothy Bode, Johnathon Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)(Thomas, Richard)
August 5, 2010 Filing 69 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeffery E Epstein (KMG)
August 4, 2010 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT of Ryan Redmon re #67 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jeffrey Epstein by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Akmajian, Peter)
August 4, 2010 Filing 67 APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Jeffrey Epstein by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Akmajian, Peter) Modified on 8/5/2010 CORRECTION: To Text and Correct Event. Motion termed. (KMG).
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER pursuant to #65 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Bobbie Bode answer due 8/10/2010, Timothy Bode answer due 8/10/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/3/2010. (NVO)
August 2, 2010 Filing 65 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Timothy Bode. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thomas, Richard)
August 2, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R Thomas on behalf of Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Timothy Bode (Thomas, Richard)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER pursuant to #62 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Michele Connor answer due 8/10/2010; Johnathon Munoz answer due 8/10/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/29/2010. (NVO)
July 27, 2010 Filing 62 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Johnathon Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Time Schedule Order)(Thomas, Richard)
July 27, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R Thomas on behalf of Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Johnathon Munoz (Thomas, Richard)
July 27, 2010 Filing 60 MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Pursuant to Rule 55(C) by Michelle Barnes, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Ramen Verma. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Susan Feng, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David Minozzi, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Amir Farooqui (Hussain), #4 Affidavit Declaration of Irum Hussain, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Juan Castillo-Plaza, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Sixta Castillo, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle Barnes, #8 Affidavit Declaration of Raman Verma)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Compel Alternative Dispute Resolution and Dismiss. Plaintiff and Susan Epstein are directed to comply with the mediation and arbitration provisions set forth in paragraph 14.2 of the franchise agreement (see Dkt. #24-1 at 38). The claims asserted against Susan Epstein are dismissed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/24/10.(LAD)
June 7, 2010 Filing 58 OBJECTION re #53 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Jeff Barson (entitled: Answer). (REW)
June 7, 2010 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jeff Barson.(REW)
June 2, 2010 Filing 56 REPLY in Support re #24 MOTION to Compel Alternative Dispute Resolution and Motion to Dismiss, Without Prejudice, or to Stay Proceeding filed by Susan A Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shely, Robert)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER pursuant to #54 Stipulation: Defendant Epstein shall file her reply in support of motion to compel alternative dispute resolution and motion to dismiss on or before 6/2/2010. The parties are advised that the Court will not grant additional extensions absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/2/2010. (NVO)
June 1, 2010 Filing 54 STIPULATION re #24 MOTION to Compel Alternative Dispute Resolution and Motion to Dismiss, Without Prejudice, or to Stay Proceeding for Extension of Time to Reply by Susan A Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shely, Robert)
May 25, 2010 Filing 53 SET ASIDE (Vacated) per Court Order #178 ... Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michelle Barnes, Jeff Barson, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Susan Feng, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, David M Minozzi, Roger Stratt, Ramen Verma. (REW) Modified on 5/6/2011 (KMG).
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #31 Stipulation: Defendant Susan Epstein shall file her reply in support of her motion to compel and motion to dismiss on or before 5/31/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/24/2010. (NVO)
May 21, 2010 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Ramen Verma, M.D. served on 03/04/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed, by DLC Dermacare LLC. Roger Stratt M.D. served on 03/04/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. David M. Minozzi, M.D. served on 03/01/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Irum Hussain served on 03/01/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Amir Hussain served on 03/01/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC.Susan Feng served on 03/01/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Juan Castillo-Plaza, M.D. served on 03/04/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Sixta Castillo R.N. served on 03/17/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Jeff Barson served on 03/03/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL). Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Michelle Barnes M.D. served on 03/02/10. (Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (certificate of service) to (summons returned executed. Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 41 Application for Entry of Default Against Ramen Verma by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 40 Application for Entry of Default Against Roger Stratt by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 39 Application for Entry of Default Against David Minozzi by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 38 Application for Entry of Default Against Irum Hussain by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 37 Application for Entry of Default Against Amir Hussain by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 36 Application for Entry of Default Against Susan Feng by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 35 Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant Juan Castillo-Plaza by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 34 Application for Entry of Default Against Sixta Castillo by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 33 Application for Entry of Default Against Jeff Barson by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 32 Application for Entry of Default Against Michelle Barnes by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Akmajian, Peter) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (request) to (application for entry of default) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ESL).
May 21, 2010 Filing 31 STIPULATION re #24 MOTION to Compel Alternative Dispute Resolution and Motion to Dismiss, Without Prejudice, or to Stay Proceeding for Extension of Time to Reply by Susan A Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shely, Robert)
May 21, 2010 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT of To Notice of Settlement re #28 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff DLC Dermacare LLC. (Akmajian, Peter)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Shannon Maltais only within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Vacating any pending hearings as to Defendant Shannon Maltais only. Denying all pending motions as moot as to Defendant Shannon Maltais only. Directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter as to Defendant Shannon Maltais only on June 14, 2010 without further leave of Court. Possible Dismissal as to defendant Shannon Maltais due by 6/14/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/14/10. (DMT)
May 14, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Settlement by Shannon Maltais(M.D.), Shannon Maltais (Collins, Gregory)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER pursuant to #25 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Shannon Maltais(M.D.) answer due 5/14/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/12/2010. (NVO)
May 12, 2010 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Compel Alternative Dispute Resolution and Motion to Dismiss, Without Prejudice, or to Stay Proceeding filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Akmajian, Peter)
May 7, 2010 Filing 25 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Second Request) by Shannon Maltais. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Second Stipulation of Time for Defendant Shannon Maltais to Answer)(Collins, Gregory)
April 23, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION to Compel Alternative Dispute Resolution and Motion to Dismiss, Without Prejudice, or to Stay Proceeding by Susan A Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shely, Robert)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER pursuant to #22 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Shannon Maltais answer due 5/7/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/22/2010. (NVO)
April 21, 2010 Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Shannon Maltais. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Dr. Shannon Maltais to Answer)(Collins, Gregory)
April 2, 2010 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Fox Development Company served on 3/5/2010. (ESL)
April 2, 2010 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. James E Fox served on 3/5/2010. (ESL)
April 2, 2010 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Shannon C Fox served on 3/5/2010. (ESL)
April 2, 2010 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Sixta Castillo served on 3/17/2010. (ESL)
March 25, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Brian L Fox by Brian L Fox. (LSP)
March 24, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PARTY DISMISSAL re Voluntary Dismissal, with Prejudice, as to Defendants Thomas Moffo, M.D., Alison Moffo, Dominic Moffo, M.D. and Kim D. Moffo, Only by DLC Dermacare LLC (Akmajian, Peter) Modified on 3/25/2010 (LAD). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM OTHER NOTICE TO NOTICE OF PARTY DISMISSAL.
March 17, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Roger Stratt served on 3/4/2010. (TLJ)
March 17, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Michelle Barnes served on 3/2/2010. (TLJ)
March 17, 2010 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLC Dermacare LLC. Juan Castillo-Plaza served on 3/4/2010. (TLJ)
March 15, 2010 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed - David M Minozzi served on 3/1/2010. (KMG) FILE DATE HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (3/23/10) TO (3/15/10) ON 3/24/2010 (DTN).
March 15, 2010 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Amir Hussain served on 3/1/2010. (KMG) FILE DATE HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (3/23/10) TO (3/15/10) ON 3/24/2010 (DTN).
March 15, 2010 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Susan Feng served on 3/1/2010. (KMG) FILE DATE HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (3/23/10) TO (3/15/10) ON 3/24/2010 (DTN).
March 15, 2010 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Irum Hussain served on 3/1/2010. (KMG)
February 19, 2010 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Juan Castillo-Plaza, Irum Hussain. (Attachments: #1 Juan Castillo-Plaza, M.D)(AMB). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
February 18, 2010 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Douglas Keverline. (AMB). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
February 18, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by DLC Dermacare LLC (Akmajian, Peter)
February 18, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ABC Partners, Michelle Barnes, Jeff Barson, Michele Connor Bobbie Bode, Timothy Bode, Sixta Castillo, Juan Castillo-Plaza, Charles H. Goforth Revocable Trust, Jeffery E Epstein, Susan A Epstein, Susan Feng, Brian L Fox, James E Fox, Shannon C Fox, Fox Development Company, Gary K. Goforth Trust, Charles H Goforth, Gary K Goforth, Steven M Goforth, Teri L Goforth, Tommi R Goforth, Scott Gulbranson, Theresa Gulbranson, Amir Hussain, Irum Hussain, Anshu Jain, Nora Jain, Renea D Jain, Suneil Jain, Gregory M Johnson, John Johnson, Latha Johnson, Shannon Maltais, Daniel P McDonald, David M Minozzi, Alison Moffo, Dominic Moffo, Kim D Moffo, Thomas Moffo, Johnathon Munoz, Babak Nafe, Nohemi Nafe, Perfect Image, LLC, Quality Skincare, LLC, Anjana Samaddar, Guatam Samaddar, Abraham Sayegh, Christina Sayegh, Southside Development, LLC, Roger Stratt, Kudlip Thusu, Lisa Vanbockern, Ramen Verma, Marc A Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Abraham Sayegh, M.D., #2 Alison Moffo, #3 Amir Hussain, #4 Anjana Samaddar, #5 Anshu Jain, #6 Babak Nafe, M.D., #7 Brian Fox, D.O., #8 Charles H Goforth, #9 Charles H. Goforth Revocable Trust, #10 Christina Sayegh, #11 Daniel P McDonald, M.D., #12 Dominic Skip Moffo, M.D, #13 Fox Development Company, #14 Gary K. Goforth Trust, #15 Gary K. Goforth, #16 Gregory M. Johnson, #17 Guatam Samaddar, M.D., #18 James E Fox, #19 Jeff Barson, #20 Jeffrey E Epstein, M.D., #21 John Johnson, M.D., #22 Johnathon Munoz, M.D., #23 Kudlip Thusu, M.D., #24 Latha Johnson, #25 Lisa Vanbockern, #26 Marc A Wilson, M.D., #27 Michelle Barnes, M.D., #28 Michelle Connor Bobbie Bode, #29 Nohemi Nafe, #30 Nora Jain, #31 Perfect Image, LLC, #32 Quality Skincare, LLC, #33 Ramen Verma, M.D, #34 Renea D Jain, #35 Roger Stratt, M.D, #36 Scott Gulbranson, #37 Shannon C. FOx, #38 Shannon Maltais, M.D, #39 Sixta Castillo, R.N., #40 Southside Development, LLC, #41 Steven M Goforth, #42 Suneil Jain, M.D., #43 Susan Feng, #44 Susan A. Epstein, #45 Teri L Goforth, #46 Theresa Gulbranson, #47 Thomas Moffo, M.D., #48 Timothy Bode, M.D., #49 Tommi R Goforth, #50 David M. Minozzi, M.D., #51 Kim D Moffo)(AMB). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
February 17, 2010 Filing 4 Notice re Magistrate consent form. (AMB)
February 17, 2010 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-10-333-PHX-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AMB)
February 17, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Akmajian, Peter)
February 17, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 0970-3635862, filed by DLC Dermacare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons, #51 Summons, #52 Summons, #53 Summons, #54 Summons, #55 Summons, #56 Summons)(Akmajian, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLC Dermacare LLC v. Castillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Moffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Keverline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc A Wilson
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guatam Samaddar
Represented By: James H Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim D Moffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Moffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery E Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anjana Samaddar
Represented By: James H Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary K Goforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Moffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Development Company
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nohemi Nafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Barnes
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Skincare LLC
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skip Moffo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kudlip Thusu
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H. Goforth Revocable Trust
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Feng
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renea D Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suneil Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Hussain
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian L Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramen Verma
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Fox
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Image LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anshu Jain
Represented By: Richard R Thomas
Represented By: Andrew Stewart Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommi R Goforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathon Munoz
Represented By: Richard R Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Barson
Represented By: Fredrick Martin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latha Johnson
Represented By: James H Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary K. Goforth Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Castillo-Plaza
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan A Epstein
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Robert Stalnaker Reder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Sayegh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon C Fox
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Sayegh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southside Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gulbranson
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri L Goforth
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M Goforth
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P McDonald
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irum Hussain
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Connor Bobbie Bode
Represented By: Richard R Thomas
Represented By: Michael A Schern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Johnson
Represented By: James H Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Vanbockern
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles H Goforth
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora Jain
Represented By: Richard R Thomas
Represented By: Andrew Stewart Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Maltais
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Stratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sixta Castillo
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Gulbranson
Represented By: Andre Harbon Merrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bode
Represented By: Richard R Thomas
Represented By: Michael A Schern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Minozzi
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Represented By: Jenessa GB Coccaro
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babak Nafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLC Dermacare LLC
Represented By: Andre E Carman
Represented By: Peter Akmajian
Represented By: Matthew Allen Klopp
Represented By: Adam Lloyd Stafford
Represented By: Ben Joshua Himmelstein
Represented By: Ryan Wystan Redmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl J Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Robert A Mackenzie
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Represented By: Michael P Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?