Hernandez v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al

Case Number: 2:2010cv00432
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 24). Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss is granted; the First Amended Complaint is dismissed without preju dice for failure to exhaust; in the alternative, it is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.2(i). Defendants' 24 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/18/10. (ESL)
June 11, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - IT IS ORDERED: Dfts Wall and William are dismissed without prejudice. Dfts Dolezal and Wheeler must answer the Amended Complaint.The Clerk of Court must send Pla a service packet including the 9 First Amended Complaint, thi s Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dfts Dolezal and Wheeler. Service Packet due by 7/1/2010. Dft must answer the First Amended Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable pro visions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/11/10. (SAT)
May 7, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. The Complaint is dismissed with 30 days leave to amend. Clerk shall enter dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/6/10.(LSP) Modified on 5/7/2010, to include "opinion", (LSP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?