Coit v. Sutton Funding LLC et al

Plaintiff: Theodore E Coit, Jr
Defendant: Unknown Parties, HomEq Servicing Corporation and Sutton Funding LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00436
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/10.(DMT)
June 22, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/22/10.(TLJ)
May 24, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Ex Parte Motion to Quash Lis Pendens FURTHER ORDERED granting with prejudice 8 Motion to Dismiss FURTHER ORDERED denying 22 Motion for production, inspection, and copying FURTHER ORDERED Striking Plaintiff's 25 Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/21/10. (MAP)
April 23, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 , 17 Ex Parte Motions for Extension of Time FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to quash 7 on or before 4/30/10. FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to dismiss 8 on or before 4/30/10. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/23/10. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coit v. Sutton Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomEq Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutton Funding LLC
Represented By: Robert Wayne Norman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore E Coit, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?