Wilkins v. Shirleson et al

Petitioner: Brian Allen Wilkins
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2010cv00443
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 33 : Based thereon, the petition at docket 1 is DENIED. The Clerk will please enter judgment dismissing the petition with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court will not grant the Certifica te of Appealability required by 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c), nor will it grant leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, because petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. If petitioner desires to take an appeal, he must request a Certificate of Appealabilty from the Court of Appeals. (LAD)
January 27, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER From Chambers - For the reasons stated, this court adopts Magistrate Judge Aspey's recommended findings and conclusions. Based thereon, the motion at docket 14 is DENIED, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is STAYED pending the fil ing in this court by one or both parties of a copy of the Arizona Court of Appeals' decision at which time the STAY shall be deemed to have been lifted without further order from this court. At that time magistrate judge shall continue with such proceedings as may be necessary to bring this matter to a conclusion. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 1/27/11. (KMG)
January 7, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's Motion for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Doc. 20) is denied. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/5/11.(KMG)
April 7, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the 1 Petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 04/05/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Shirleson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Allen Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Heckathorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?