United States of America v. Vistoso Partners, L.L.C.

Case Number: 2:2010cv00444
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Defendant's Motion for New Trial and denying 91 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/20/12.(DMT)
January 20, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/20/12.(DMT)
January 3, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - For the reasons stated, the Court finds in favor of Plaintiff and will enter judgment in its favor. Plaintiff is ordered to submit a proposed final judgment by January 17, 2012. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/3/12. (DMT)
June 27, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/27/2011.(NVO)
June 6, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/6/2011.(NVO)
November 23, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties placed a discovery conference call to the Court on November 22, 2010. Plaintiff asked the Court to strike Defendant's expert witness disclosures as insufficient under the Court's Case Management Order and Rule 26. After taking the matter under advisement, the Court will grant Plaintiff's request. Defendant's expert witnesses are stricken and will not be permitted to testify in this litigation. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/23/10. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Vistoso Partners, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?