James v. Ryan, et al

Plaintiff: Thomas M. James
Defendant: Charles L Ryan and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv00510
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 40 Motion for clarification to the extent detailed in this order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/8/13.(REW)
January 15, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 31 and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 37 . Granting 31 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's claim is dismissed without prejud ice for failure to exhaust. Denying 37 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. The action is terminated, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. An Appeal from the judgment in this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/14/13.(TLJ)
August 6, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Disclosure is denied. Count Two is dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Ryan mu st answer Count One of the First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet and Plaintiff must complete and return within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/6/2012. (See attached PDF for complete details.) (LFIG)
April 19, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; the Court will give Plaintiff 45 days (rather than 60) to file a first amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a strike under 28:1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/19/12.(TLJ)
March 31, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla's Application 3 to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Pla must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is not assessed an initial partial filing fee. The Comp laint (Doc. #1) is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1), and the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Pla's Motion 5 for Temporary Restraining Order in Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/31/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Ryan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?