Smith v. Hoskyns

Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Smith
Defendant: Robert N Hoskyns
Case Number: 2:2010cv00531
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment(Doc. 33) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Disposition Re Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 40) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/17/12.(LAD)
January 6, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice dft's 11 Motion to Dismiss. (See document for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/6/11.(LAD)
August 25, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall file and serve a responsive memorandum to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before September 8, 2010. Should Plaintiff fail to comply, the Court may deem Plaintiff's failure to oppose the Motion as a waiver, and may grant the motion on that basis. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 08/25/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hoskyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert N Hoskyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?