U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Weber

Plaintiff: United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Helmut H Weber
Case Number: 2:2010cv00534
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 17 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Helmut H. Weber that was taken under advisement in 20 Order. Defendant shall pay restitution. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/22/11. (LSP)
December 9, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 17 Motion for Default Judgment. Granted with respect to injunctive relief, and will reserve judgment on restitution and civil penalty subject to a supplemental filing by plaintiff. Defendant and any other persons or entities acting on behalf of, at the direction of, or for the benefit of Defendant are permanently enjoined. Plaintiff shall submit a supplementary memorandum by December 29, 2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/9/10. (see order for full details)(DMT)
October 7, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that, within 10 days of this order, Plaintiff file the valid Certificate of Service for this motion or file a memorandum showing why the present certificate is valid. (See document for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/6/10. (LAD)
April 16, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/16/2010.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmut H Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Timothy J Mulreany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?