Robinson et al v. GE Money Bank et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan E Robinson, Sally J Robinson-Burke, Rosa A. Silvas and Amanda Holbert
Defendant: GE Money Bank, WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., America's Servicing Company, MERSCORP Incorporated, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal National Mortgage Association, GMAC Mortgage Group, LLC, National City Mortgage, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., CitiMortgage Incorporated, HSBC Mortgage Corporation USA, AIG United Guaranty Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., America's Wholesale Lender, Executive Trustee Services, LLC and Federal Housing Finance Agency
Case Number: 2:2010cv00630
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 MERSCORP Holdings, Inc.'s and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment against the Robinsons and Silvas. FURTHER ORDERED granting 55 Wells Fargo's and U.S. Bank's motion f or summary judgment against the Robinson Plaintiffs. FURTHER ORDERED granting 53 that Bank of America N.A's, Bank of New York Mellon's and ReconTrust's motion for summary judgment against Silvas. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of these 7 Defendants and against these 3 Plaintiffs, accordingly. The Clerk of the Court shall close CV 10-630-PHX-JAT as a result of this Order. The Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in both the MD case number, and the member case number listed. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/25/16. (MDL-09-2119)(MAP)
April 20, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Robinson and Silvas Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental brief on the issues discussed above not to exceed five pages by April 25, 2016. Any Defendant may each respond, in a brief not to exceed five pages, by April 29 , 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court must file a copy of this Order in both the MDL case number and the one member case listed above. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/20/16. (LAD)
September 30, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER In Regards to Robinson the following Motions are GRANTED (all Motions filed in Lead MDL-2119): Defendant Citimortgage, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Doc. 261); Defendant GE Money Bank's Motion to D ismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint (Doc. 280); Defendants National City Bank, National City Mortgage, National City Corporation and PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Count Eight of the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 288); Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [#91 in Robinson] (Doc. 303); Certain Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Doc. 311); Defendants MERSCORP, Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Doc. 326). SEE ORDER FOR FULL/COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/30/10. (Original Order filed in Lead MDL-2119, Doc. (1170)). (MAP)
March 23, 2010 1 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That with respect to Robinson (CV 09-227-TUC-JAT), claim 8 and part of claims 10 and 11 remain with the undersigned as part of the MDL and claims 1-7, 9 and part of claims 10 and 11 are remanded to the transferor court. Of particular note, all claims against Defendant First American Title Company are remanded. To accomplish this remand, the Clerk of the Court is directed to bifurcate Robinson into two cases; the Clerk of the Court shall draw and assign a new Phoenix case number to the port ion of the Robinson case that is remaining with the undersigned and the Clerk of the Court shall consolidate that case number into the MDL as a member case. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer the original Robinson case number back to the transferor court (Chief Judge Roll). SEE ORDER FOR FULL/COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/22/10. (Original Order filed in Lead MDL-2119, doc #211). (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. GE Money Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan E Robinson
Represented By: Valerie Robinson Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally J Robinson-Burke
Represented By: Valerie Robinson Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa A. Silvas
Represented By: William Albert Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Holbert
Represented By: William Albert Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Money Bank
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMC Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Maureen Beyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP Incorporated
Represented By: Robert M Brochin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Robert M Brochin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Gregory W Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: James R Condo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Group, LLC
Represented By: Ira Steven Lefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage
Represented By: Brian Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Douglas Cameron Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage Incorporated
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Corporation USA
Represented By: Joseph E Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG United Guaranty Corporation
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas M Hefferon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Wholesale Lender
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Trustee Services, LLC
Represented By: Ira Steven Lefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: David B Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?