Weinstein v. Arpaio, et al

Plaintiff: Eric Weinstein
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio, Maricopa, County of, Ava Arpaio and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv00697
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED The reference to Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin is withdrawn only with respect to Pla's 20 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and/or Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Pla's 20 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and/or Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is denied. All other matters must remain with Magistrate Judge Jay R. Irwin fordisposition as appropriate. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/21/10. (SAT)
June 14, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla's Motion 8 to Alter or Amend Judgment or in the Alternative, Motionfor Appointment of Counsel and Motion for Extension of Time is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) Pla's motion to alter or amend judgment is deni ed; (b) Pla's motion for a page extension is granted; (c) Pla's motion for appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice; and (d) Pla's motion for extension of time is granted. Pla has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. Pla may file a second amended complaint that contains one single-sided page for each of the 21 claims he wishes to present. In all other respects, Pla must comply with the instructions at tached to the court-approved form. If Pla fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/11/10.(KMG)
May 12, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 6 is dismissed for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.4(a). Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/12/10. (DMT)
April 2, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Complaint (filed in the Maricopa County Superior Court and attached to Doc 1 ) is dismissed for failure to file on the court-approved form. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file an amended complaint in complianc e with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice.Special Prisoner Deadline due by 5/2/2010. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/2/10. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinstein v. Arpaio, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?