Woods, et al v. Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al.

Plaintiff: Jonathan B Woods and Kerrie Woods
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., ReconTrust Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Unknown Parties and BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Case Number: 2:2010cv00723
Filed: March 31, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney General Intervention, Doc. 52, is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Order, Doc. 53, is DENIED. Request for Judicial Notice, Doc. 55, is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint, Doc. 57, is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/12/2011.(KMG)
July 15, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting the Motion to Dismiss Case by BAC Home Loan Servicing LP, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Doc. 27, and dismissing BAC Home Loan Servicing LP, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated with prejudice as Defendants in this case. Granting the Motion to Strike "Notice of Criminal Complaint and Affidavit of Fact" by Cynthia J. Cantrell, Doc. 39. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/15/2011.(KMG)
July 30, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 22 Motion to Amend filed by Pla is GRANTED; directing Plas file the Amended Complaint and serve the amended pleading on all parties under Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within fourteen (14) days of the filing of this Order; that the Motions to Dismiss filed by First American and the BAC Dfts (Docs. 7 , 10 ) are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/30/10. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods, et al v. Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew David Bedwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Russell M Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan B Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerrie Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?