Reishus, et al. v. Almaraz, et al

Plaintiff: Roxanne Brinker and Oliver Reishus
Defendant: Efren Almaraz and Unknown Almaraz
Case Number: 2:2010cv00760
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Plaintiffs' 103 Motion for Alternative Service of Process; Plaintiffs must properly serve Defendant Merino with process on or before 5/9/11, or, alternatively, Plaintiffs must show cause on or before 5/9/11 why Defendant Merino should not be dismissed for failure to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/21/11.(REW)
February 28, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; the Joint Motion to Quash Service of Process Upon Defendant Eduardo Merino 97 is granted; the Joint Request for Order Regarding Testimony of Eduardo Merino 97 is denied without prejudice; the Court's 2/23/11 Or der 99 is vacated to the extent that it directed Defendants Almaraz, EA Trucking, their non-party liability insurance, and defense counsel to file a status report; Plaintiffs shall properly serve Mr Merino with process or shall show cause by 3/31/1 1 why Mr Merino should not be dismissed from this lawsuit; absent timely notice to the Court of proper service or a showing of good cause, Mr Merino will be dismissed as a party to this lawsuit with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/25/11. (REW)
February 23, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 84 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Compel as set forth herein. Status report due on 4/1/11. All other requested relief is denied without prejudice (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/23/11.(TLJ)
January 12, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 80 Motion to Compel Defendant Eduardo Merino to Appear for Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/11/11.(REW)
January 6, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant EA Trucking's 46 Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim of Defendant Best Tires and dismissing Best Tires' cross-claim for indemnity with prejudice; all counsel shall use the above single caption on all future filings until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/6/11.(REW)
September 29, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; within 14 days of the filing of the order, Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint (see order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/29/10.(REW)
July 6, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Consistent with LRCiv 15.1 and within 14 days of the filing of the order granting leave to amend, Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint. See PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/6/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reishus, et al. v. Almaraz, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Brinker
Represented By: Craig Joel Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Reishus
Represented By: Craig Joel Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efren Almaraz
Represented By: Charles Donald Onofry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Almaraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?