Neuendorf v. Unknown Party et al

Plaintiff: John Calvin Neuendorf, II
Defendant: Unknown Rivas and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2010cv00766
Filed: April 6, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion to Compel to Set Aside Order. This case must remain closed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/20/13. (LAD)
December 6, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) Plaintiff's Motion: for Copy of Docket CV 00766-RCB (Doc. 17) is granted in part to the extent that the Clerk of Court must send to Plaintiff a copy of the docket in this action and denied in part as to all other relief requested. (2) This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/6/10.(LAD)
November 16, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Pla's "Motion: Bond For Costs On Appeal In A Civil Case Rule 7" (Doc. 11), "Motion For Discovery (Injuries)" (Doc. 12), and "Motion for Bond for Costs on Appeal in a Civil Case Title II Rule 7" (Doc. 13) are denied as moot. Pla's "Motion: For Transcripts of Comple[]te Record" (Doc. 14) and "Motion: To or for Reconsideration Rule 60(B)" (Doc. 15) are both denied. This case must remain closed. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/15/10.(KMG)
September 16, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to the Court (Doc. 5) and Motion for Consideration to Reopen Case (Doc. 6), which the Court treats as being brought pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, are both denied. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/14/10.(LAD)
April 9, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT and the Clerk shall enter judgment. The Clerk must file a copy of the Complaint (Doc. #1) as a First Amended Complaint in case #CV 10-124-PHX-RCB (DKD), nunc pro tunc April 6, 2010. The Clerk must close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/8/10. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neuendorf v. Unknown Party et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Calvin Neuendorf, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?