Doe et al v. Swift Transportation Co., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: John Doe, Joseph Sheer, Virginia Van Dusen, Phyllis I Taillie, Traci Wiggins, Odis Sumner, Herbert Muncey, Tracy Nouthcutt, Patti K. Hansen, Earle V. Becker, Jr., Jose R. Algandar, Joseph Scott Mertz, Michael R. Lyons, Ray E. Carr, Sr., Shane M. Kincaid and James P. David
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company, Inc., Interstate Equipment Leasing, Inc., Chad Killibrew and Jerry Moyes
Case Number: 2:2010cv00899
Filed: April 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2017 918 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 879 Motion to Stay; 883 Motion to Certify Class; 884 Motion to Certify Class; 884 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendants' motion at docket 879 is GRANTED. This case is stayed pending appeal. Plaintiffs' motions at docket 883 and 884 are denied without prejudice to renewal if appropriate following conclusion of the appeal. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 2/24/17. (JWS)
January 6, 2017 862 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPIONION - Plaintiffs' motion at docket 771 is GRANTED. Defendants' motions for summary judgment as to each individual Plaintiff at dockets 744 , 751 , 757 , 763 , and 768 are DENIED. The preceding discussion shows that even without considering the evidence obtained in discovery, Plaintiffs had contracts of employment. Accordingly, Defendants' motion at docket 820 for reconsideration of the case management order or certification of an interlocutory appeal is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 01/05/2017. (ATD)
December 28, 2015 713 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 696 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs shall appear for deposition in Arizona on or before February 29, 2016. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/28/15.(JWS)
December 18, 2015 712 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 684 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs' motion at docket 684 for sanctions is DENIED. In an effort to facilitate completion of discovery, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants provide the discovery materials and discovery log as more fully described in this order on or before January 15, 2016. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/18/15.(JWS)
November 13, 2015 703 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 646 Motion to Compel and granting 649 Motion to Compel. Pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5) and based on counsel's supporting declaration at docket 647 , the court concludes that attorney's fees in the amount of $7,500 is reasonable for counsel's work on the motion. Given that the current deadline was November 11, 2015, the court recognizes that Plaintiffs will need additional time to substantively respond to Defendants' requests and that Defendants ma y need more time to conduct any follow up discovery. The parties are directed to confer and provide the court with a proposed deadline for Plaintiffs' response and any further discovery on the part of Defendants. The proposed deadline shall be set out in a stipulation to be filed within 7 days. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/13/15.(SJF)
July 15, 2015 645 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 631 Motion to Compel. Defendants are directed to respond to the requests listed in Exhibit E in compliance with the guidance provided in this order, but Defendants need not provide documents specifically related to drivers not involved in this litigation. Given that the motion has been denied in part, the court concludes that the sanctions requested by both parties are not warranted. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 7/15/15.(JWS)
February 17, 2015 622 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the court does not find the motion 612 is frivolous and that sanctions are warranted; this court declines to comment further on any issue regarding the appealability of the court's order at 605 , that will be left for resolution by the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 2/17/15.(REW)
January 22, 2015 605 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 566 Defendant's Motion. Each of the deadlines in the order at (Doc. 548 ) is extended by 7 months. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 1/22/15.(LSP)
September 7, 2011 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff's motion at 315 is GRANTED insofar as it seeks an order certifying an interlocutory appeal of the court's order at (Doc. 223), and DENIED insofar as it requests this court to reconsider its order at (Doc. 223). Plaintiffs' motion at 277 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/6/11.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Swift Transportation Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sheer
Represented By: Tara Margo Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Van Dusen
Represented By: Tara Margo Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis I Taillie
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Wiggins
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odis Sumner
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Muncey
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Nouthcutt
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti K. Hansen
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earle V. Becker, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose R. Algandar
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Scott Mertz
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Lyons
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray E. Carr, Sr.
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane M. Kincaid
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. David
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company, Inc.
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Equipment Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Killibrew
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Moyes
Represented By: Laurent Richard George Badoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?