Thomas v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, et al.

Plaintiff: Steve G Thomas
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., First American Title Insurance Company of Arizona, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv00901
Filed: April 23, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Wells Fargo's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration and denying 92 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/26/12.(LSP)
May 8, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff Steve Thomas shall have until 5/22/12 to respond to Wells Fargo Bank's 92 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/8/12. (REW)
April 2, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s 68 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 71 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Defendant Wells Fargo is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 04/02/12. (ESL)
October 28, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 75 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/28/11.(ESL)
August 29, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 57 Motion to Quash Lis Pendens and quashing the lis pendens recorded with the Maricopa County Recorder's Office on April 21, 2010, regarding the property located at 3644 E. Maffeo Road, Phoenix, Arizona 85050, bearing recording number 20100336001. Defendant is awarded its attorneys' fees incurred in bringing this motion upon its compliance with LRCiv. 54.2. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 08/29/11.(ESL)
July 21, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Amend is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 07/20/11. (ESL)
August 26, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Counts Three and Four of the FAC are dismissed with leave to amend. It is further ordered that Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Amend is granted. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on or before 09/27/10. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 08/26/10.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company of Arizona
Represented By: Michael Joseph Plati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve G Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?