Kotzev v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Zdravko Kotzev
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Steve Butcher, Unknown Parties, Maria Land and Maricopa, County of
Case Number: 2:2010cv00907
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 defendant's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 68 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 70 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/16/13.(LSP)
March 17, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motion for recusal (doc. 32 ).IT IS ORDERED GRANTING defendants' motion for clarification (doc. 31 ) andclarifying that counts 6 and 7 are dismissed as against both defendants Ryan and Butcher. Th ere are no remaining claims asserted against Butcher, and he is dismissed as a defendant from this case. IT IS ORDERED GRANTING Maricopa County's motion to dismiss (doc. 21 ) and GRANTING Maricopa County's motion for summary disposition (d oc. 28 ). IT IS ORDERED DENYING plaintiff's motion for entry of default (doc. 23 ), and GRANTING defendants' motion to quash (doc. 25 ). Because defendant Land has not been served in compliance with Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., and this court's Order dated 7/16/2010 (doc. 13), IT IS ORDERED DISMISSING Land from this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/16/11.(SAT)
February 18, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part the 8 motion to dismiss Pla's claims for damages against Dft Ryan. Counts 6 and 7 of Pla's complaint are dismissed as against this Dft. Pla may not obtain any damages from Dft Ryan in connection with any of his rema ining claims. It is further ordered denying in part the motion to dismiss Pla's entire complaint against Dft Charles Ryan. Pla's constitutional claims, Counts 1-5, to the extent Pla seeks declaratory and injunctive relief from Dft Ryan, are not dismissed; directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 02/16/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotzev v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zdravko Kotzev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Alice Jolynn Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Butcher
Represented By: Alice Jolynn Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Land
Represented By: Alice Jolynn Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?