Haskins, et al. v. Moynihan, et al.

Plaintiff: Michael Edward Haskins and Barbara Ann Haskins
Defendant: Brian T Moynihan, James F Taylor, Angelo Mazilo, R K Arnold and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2010cv01000
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Arnold's 72 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint with prejudice; denying as moot Plaintiffs' 74 Motion to Remand; Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with Rule 4(m), as to Defendants Moynihan, Taylor, Mazilo, Zarro and Haggerty; the Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/3/11.(REW)
October 12, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Quash Service of Summons and directing the Clerk to strike the Summons Returned Executed (Docs. 62-65). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Plaintiffs to properly serve the Summons and Second Amended Complaint upon Defendants. If Plaintiffs fail to prosecute this action or comply with the rules or any Court Order, the Court may dismiss the action with prejudice. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/12/10.(LSP)
August 23, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion for Clarification re: How Much Time Remains for Service; denying 55 Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiff's Petition for Emergency Petition for a Temporary Restraining Order; denying 55 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendants: Mary Haggerty and Michael R Zarro Jr; denying 56 Motion for Stay of All Non-Judicial Proceedings. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/23/10.(REW)
August 12, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiffs are directed to file and serve the amended pleading within 14 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO to Plaintiffs' filing of a motion for leave to file a third amended complaint in compliance with this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/12/10.(LSP)
July 6, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 7 Motion to Dismiss Case and granting 9 Motion to Dismiss Case; Defendants Bear Stearns, John Vella, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, Countrywide Homeloans, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and Recontrust Company, N.A. shall be DISMISSED from this case without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 10 Defendants' Motion to Quash ; Plaintiffs shall have until August 28, 2010 to effect service of process on R. K. Arnold, Angelo Mazilo, Brian T. Moynihan, and James Taylor. Should Plaintiffs fail to provide proof of service by that date, the Clerk is directed to TERMINATE these Defendants without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 38 Defendants John Vella and Bear Stearns Residential Mortgage Coporation's Motion to Strike; the Clerk is directed to STRIKE 13 , 14 , 15 , 16 , 17 , 18 , 21 , 22 , 23 , 30 and 31 Plaintiffs' Judicial Notices and 42 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/6/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haskins, et al. v. Moynihan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T Moynihan
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F Taylor
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Mazilo
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R K Arnold
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?