Facciola, et al v. Greenberg Traurig, LLP, et al

Plaintiff: Jewel Box Loan Company, Inc., Jewel Box, Inc., H-M Investments, LLC, Fred C. Hagel and Jacqueline M. Hagel Revocable Living Trust Dated March 15, 1995, Robert Facciola, Robert Maurice Facciola Trust Dated December 2, 1994, Honeylou C Reznik, Morris Reznik and Honeylou C. Reznik Trust and Judith A Baker
Defendant: Diane Rose Hirsch, Howard Evan Walder, Berta Friedman Walder, Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Quarles & Brady, LLP, CBIZ, Inc., CBIZ MHM, LLC, Mayer Hoffman McCann, PC, Michael M Denning, Donna J Denning, Todd S Brown, Cynthia D Brown, Christopher J Olson, Rachel L Schwartz-Olson, Jeffrey A Newman, Kathleen N Newman, Tom Hirsch, Harish Pannalal Shah and Madhavi H Shah
Case Number: 2:2010cv01025
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2012 481 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 477 Motion to Extend, DENYING Motion for Reconsideration and GRANTING Motion for Expedited Ruling. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/4/2012. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
November 16, 2012 476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 475 Lead Plaintiffs' motion for entry of final judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/15/12.(TLJ)
October 3, 2012 468 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 428 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding fees in the amount of $13,342,093, and taxable and non-taxable costs in the amount of $1,435,527; granting in part 432 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding fees in the amount of $400,400, and non-taxable costs in the amount of $14,859.25 (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/3/12.(TLJ)
March 20, 2012 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 256 plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class. ORDER that the law firm of Tiffany & Bosco, P.A. is appointed class counsel for the ML Investor Class, and Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, P.C. is appointed class counsel for the RB Investor Class. Plaintiffs shall file with the court a proposed form of notice within 14 days of the entry of this order (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/19/12.(TLJ)
March 19, 2012 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 294 Quarles' Motion to Dismiss; granting 299 Greenberg's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/16/12.(TLJ)
November 30, 2011 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 271 Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order; granting 284 Greenberg's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/30/11.(TLJ)
November 21, 2011 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 216 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The motion is granted with respect to amended claims asserted against Greenberg and Quarles. The motion is denied as to claims asserted against Maye r Hoffman. In summary, the following claims remain: (1) Count 1 against Greenberg asserted by ML and RB plaintiffs, (2) Count 1 against Quarles asserted by RB plaintiffs, (3) Count 3 against Greenberg asserted by ML and RB plaintiffs, (3) Count 3 against Quarles asserted by ML and RB plaintiffs, and (4) Count 5 against Greenberg asserted by ML plaintiffs. (See document for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/18/11.(LAD)
November 3, 2011 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 228 Greenberg's Motion to Compel and DENYING Oxford's Motion to Quash 241 . ORDER GRANTING Oxford's Motion for Protective Order 241 . The protective order entered on 7/7/11, shall apply with equal force and effect to the Oxford subpoena. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/2/11.(TLJ)
June 9, 2011 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Quarles' Motion to Dismiss; granting 103 Accountant Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 104 Greenberg's Motion to Dismiss. ORDER granting Greenberg's Motion to Dismiss Counts 4, 6, and 7 on their entirety, granting the Motion to Dismiss Counts 1 and 5 with respect to the RB Plaintiffs, and denying the Motion to Dismiss Counts 1 and 5 with respect to the ML Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/9/11.(TLJ)
May 13, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Westchester's Motion to Quash. The parties to abide by briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/12/11.(TLJ)
March 31, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED, denying the Denning and Hirsch Defendants'Motions to Dismiss. (Docs. 81 and 83 ). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/31/11. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facciola, et al v. Greenberg Traurig, LLP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Rose Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Evan Walder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berta Friedman Walder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenberg Traurig, LLP
Represented By: Ellen E Oberwetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quarles & Brady, LLP
Represented By: Scott Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBIZ, Inc.
Represented By: David F Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBIZ MHM, LLC
Represented By: David F Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayer Hoffman McCann, PC
Represented By: David F Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna J Denning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel L Schwartz-Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Newman
Represented By: David J Ouimette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen N Newman
Represented By: David J Ouimette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harish Pannalal Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madhavi H Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Box Loan Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy James Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Box, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy James Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-M Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy James Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred C. Hagel and Jacqueline M. Hagel Revocable Living Trust Dated March 15, 1995
Represented By: Andrew S Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Facciola
Represented By: Jeremy James Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maurice Facciola Trust Dated December 2, 1994
Represented By: Jeremy James Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honeylou C Reznik
Represented By: Jeremy James Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Reznik and Honeylou C. Reznik Trust
Represented By: Jeremy James Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A Baker
Represented By: Andrew S Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?