TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC v. Electronic Payment Systems, LLC

Plaintiff: TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Counter_defendant: TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC
Counter_claimant: Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01060
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 86 Motion to Amend; the Clerk shall file the Proposed Amended Counterclaims lodged as 87 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/10/11.(REW)
November 29, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting TSYS' 59 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/29/10.(REW)
November 9, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 EPS's Motion for Summary Judgment, the Rule 16 Case Management Conference is re-set to 12/21/10 at 4:30 to address EPS's remaining counterclaim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/9/10.(LSP)
September 29, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. The Court will set a Rule 16 Case Management Conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/29/2010.(NVO)
July 13, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Electronic Payment Systems, LLC's ("EPS") Motion to Transfer Related Case (Doc. 72 in CV 09-155-PHX-JAT) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file a copy of this Order in Judge Campbell's case, CV 10-1060-PHX-DGC re: (Doc. 10 ). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/13/10. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC v. Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Represented By: Scotty P Krob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSYS Acquiring Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brian J Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Represented By: Scotty P Krob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?