Rhodes v. Internal Revenue Service et al

Plaintiff: Steven I Rhodes
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Douglas Schulman and Deborah Morales
Case Number: 2:2010cv01074
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and finding as moot 26 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/10/11.(DMT)
February 8, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/8/11.(NVO)
December 28, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's 11 motion for leave to file a reply is granted. Defendants' 7 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part as stated. Plaintiff's 8 motion for default judgment is denied. Plaintiff shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(1) by properly serving the United States Attorney General and the United States Attorney for Arizona, and shall file a Certificate of Service with this Court by 01/21/11. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/27/10. (ESL)
November 24, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Continue. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 7) by December 10, 2010. Defendants may file a reply by December 17, 2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/24/10.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven I Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?