Design Trend International Interiors, Ltd. v. Cathay Enterprises, Inc.

Appellant: Design Trend International Interiors, Ltd.
Appellee: Cathay Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01079
Filed: May 18, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Design Trend's Amended Motion for Entry of Final Judgment (Doc. 114 ) is granted in the amounts stated below. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk vacate the Judgment (Doc. 93 ) entered March 6, 2012, and enter judgment pursuant to mandate and to this order in favor of Design Trend International Interiors, Ltd., against Cathay Enterprises, Inc., for: (1) $169,025.22 in damages, (2) $199,218.22 in prejudgment interest thereon at the rate of 10% per annum from June 5, 2003, until March 16, 2015, (3) $381,936.14 in attorneys' fees, (4) $10,203.93 in taxable costs, and (5) postjudgment interest on those amounts, which total $760,383.51, at the federal rate of 0.25% per annum from March 16, 2015, until paid. The Clerk shall terminate this case.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/16/2015.(KMG)
March 6, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Appellant's Motion to Amend Judgment 31 and Design Trend's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs 46 are granted; the final decision of the bankruptcy court is reversed; the portion of this Court's 2/15/12 order 87 requiring supplemental briefing on attorneys' fees is vacated; the Clerk shall enter judgment nunc pro tunc effective 3/29/11, in favor of Design Trend and against Cathay, for: (1) the principal sum of $169,025.22, with prejudgment int erest at 10 percent per annum from 6/5/03 to 3/28/11, and post judgment interest at the federal judgment rate (as of 3/29/11) of 0.26 percent from 3/29/11 until paid; (2) attorneys fees in the amount of $382,966.44; and (3) taxable costs and the amount of $10,203.93; the Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/6/12. (REW)
October 5, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Cathay's Motion for Rehearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 30 Judgment is VACATED. The reference to the bankruptcy court of case number 2:04-ap-01085-RTB is WITHDRAWN pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 157(d) for purposes of making additional findings of fact and conclusions of law. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for oral argument on Thursday, November 3, 2011, at 10:00 a.m., at the Sandra Day OConnor U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 504, 401 W. Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/5/11.(LSP)
March 29, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the final decision of the bankruptcy court is REVERSED. That the Clerk enter judgment in favor of Design Trend and against Cathay in the amount of $193,840.54, plus interest at the federal judgment rate from the date of judgment until paid. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/28/11. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Trend International Interiors, Ltd. v. Cathay Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Design Trend International Interiors, Ltd.
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cathay Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?