Dolph v. Arizona Community Protection and Treatment Center

Plaintiff: James Alvin Dolph
Defendant: Arizona Community Protection and Treatment Center
Case Number: 2:2010cv01162
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER because plaintiff Dolph's motion seeking an extension of time in which to file his appeal is untimely, and because he has shown neither "excusable neglect" or "good cause" for that untimely filing, the court hereby DENIES plaintiff's motion (Doc. 32 ). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/29/2012.(KMG)
December 12, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/10/2011. (KMG)
January 14, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Pence and Antoine must answer the Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including 9 Second Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Pence an d Antoine. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/14/11. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolph v. Arizona Community Protection and Treatment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Alvin Dolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Community Protection and Treatment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?