Shivers v. Phoenix Police Department, City of et al

Plaintiff: Corey Demar Shivers
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department, South Mountain Police Precinct, Tyler Kamp and Jennifer Moore
Case Number: 2:2010cv01175
Filed: June 2, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Notices are granted in part and denied in part (Doc. 13-15). The Notices are granted to the extent that Plaintiff seeks clarification and otherwise denied. ORDER that Plaintiff's Notices are denied to the extent that any relief is sought therein (Doc. 13-15). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/3/11. (TLJ)
September 8, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 11 motion to stop litigation fees is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 09/08/10. (ESL)
August 18, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Court construes Plaintiff's 7 "Motion to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice" as a notice of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/18/10.(TLJ)
July 8, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla's 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed with the Complaint is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Pla must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is not assessed an initi al partial filing fee. The Complaint doc.# 1 is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Pla has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Pla fails to file an amended complaint wit hin 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Pla a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/8/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shivers v. Phoenix Police Department, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Mountain Police Precinct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Kamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Demar Shivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?