St Clair et al v. Nellcor Puritan Bennett LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lisa St Clair and Richard Poulin
Defendant: Nellcor Puritan Bennett LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv01275
Filed: June 16, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Final Settlement Approval Hearing on 4/30/12 at 2:00 p.m. ORDER that Plaintiffs' counsel must prepare and file a motion for approval of settlement and attorneys' fees and litigation expenses under seal on or before 4/6/12. O RDER that Defendant and its insurance company must file a Notice of Deposit and deposit the entire settlement funds on or before 4/6/12. ORDER vacating the final pretrial conference set for 4/30/12 and the jury trial scheduled to commence on 5/7/12 (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/12/12. (TLJ)
November 7, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 66 Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. ORDERED that, except for Exhibit 36 (doc. 59, attachment 13, pages 3-97), the Clerk is kindly directed to file all other exhibits presently lodged under seal at docket 59, in the public record and not under seal. FURTHER ORDERED that Exhibit 36, (doc. 59, attachment 13, pages 3-97), shall remain sealed as a trade secret until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/7/11.(MAP)
August 12, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 61 Joint Stipulation Requesting the Filing of Exhibits Under Seal. The Clerk is directed to keep those exhibits lodged with docket 59 temporarily under seal until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/12/11. (MAP)
March 21, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Nellcor Puritan Bennett, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Reports for Non-Retained Expert Witnesses 38 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/21/11. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St Clair et al v. Nellcor Puritan Bennett LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellcor Puritan Bennett LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Grant Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa St Clair
Represented By: Scott Ian Palumbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Poulin
Represented By: Scott Ian Palumbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?